Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1139231

EP1139231 - Document processing apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  29.08.2008
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2008Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 01.10.2008  [2008/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/40]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamamoto, Yuki, Toyama Fujitsu Limited
2-1, Yasuucji 2-chome,2, Yatsuo-machi
Nei-gun, Toyama 939-2392 / JP
02 / Shiotsu, Makoto, Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
 [2001/40]
Representative(s)Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London
WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/40]Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date00311635.722.12.2000
[2001/40]
Priority number, dateJP2000009842731.03.2000         Original published format: JP 2000098427
[2001/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1139231
Date:04.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/28
[2001/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/26]
Former [2001/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Anordnung und Verfahren zur Dokumentbearbeitung[2001/40]
English:Document processing apparatus and method[2001/40]
French:Dispositif et procédé de traitement des documents[2001/40]
Examination procedure19.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/03]
11.08.2008Application withdrawn by applicant  [2008/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4456969  (HERZIK AUBREY M [US], et al) [Y] 1-38 * column 1, line 30 - line 37 * * column 1, line 53 - line 58 * * column 4, line 27 - line 65 *;
 [A]EP0810533  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-38 * column 2, line 24 - column 5, line 22 *;
 [Y]  - "TOOL TO AID TRANSLATION OF WEB PAGES INTO DIFFERENT NATIONAL LANGUAGES", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Armonk, NY, US, (1998), vol. 41, no. 1, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 223 - 224, XP000772083 [Y] 1-38 * column W *
 [A]  - GALE ET AL, "A PROGRAM FOR ALIGNING SENTENCES IN BILINGUAL CORPORA", COMPUTATIONAL LINGUISTICS, Cambridge, MA, US, (19930301), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 75 - 102, XP000431255 [A] 2-6,17-20,27,28,37,38 * the whole document *
 [A]  - MURATA ET AL, "Realtime machine translation system for the world wide web", DATABASE INSPEC, THE INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, XP002043731 [A] 1-38 * abstract *
    [] - TRANSACTIONS OF THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS B-I, JP, (199605), vol. J79B-I, no. 5, pages 364 - 372,