blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1111349

EP1111349 - Timed window ultrasonic gas meter with nose cone [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.09.2008
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU
For all designated states
AGL CONSULTANCY PTY. LTD.
AGL Centre, 111 Pacific Highway
North Sydney, NSW 2060 / AU
[N/P]
Former [2001/26]For all designated states
COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, Australian Capital Territory 2612 / AU
For all designated states
AGL CONSULTANCY PTY. LTD.
AGL Centre, 111 Pacific Highway
North Sydney, NSW 2060 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / Bignell, Noel
64 Trafalgar Street
Annandale, New South Wales 2038 / AU
02 / Braathen, Colin Walter
9 Denman Street
Turramurra, New South Wales 2014 / AU
03 / DeGroot, Gerard Jan Jeep Berend
32 Livingstone Plave
Mount Colah, New South Walex 2079 / AU
04 / Martin, Barry John
16/25 Taranto Road
Marsfield, New South Wales 2122 / AU
05 / Welsh, Charles Malcolm
1 Keyes Close
Kariong, New South Wales 2250 / AU
06 / Winter, John Graeme
8 Schofield Avenue
Earlwood, New South Wales 2206 / AU
 [2001/26]
Representative(s)Price, Nigel John King, et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Price, Nigel John King, et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2008/10]Price, Nigel John King, et al
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2001/26]Senior, Alan Murray
J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date00311671.222.12.2000
[2001/26]
Priority number, dateAU1999PQ0480122.12.1999         Original published format: AU PQ480199
[2001/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1111349
Date:27.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.04.2001
ClassificationIPC:G01F1/66, G01P5/00
[2001/26]
CPC:
G01F1/667 (EP,US); G01P5/245 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/12]
Former [2001/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesAL15.11.2001
LT15.11.2001
LV15.11.2001
MK15.11.2001
RO15.11.2001
SI15.11.2001
TitleGerman:Durchflussmesser für Gas mit zeitgesteuertem Fenster und Nasenhaube[2001/26]
English:Timed window ultrasonic gas meter with nose cone[2001/26]
French:Compteur de gaz à ultrasons avec une fenêtre temporisée et un cône[2001/26]
Examination procedure15.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/02]
24.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.05.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/44]
10.06.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4308754  (PEDERSEN NORMAN E, et al) [A] 1,4,5,11 * column 6, line 21 - column 7, line 54; figures 3-5 *;
 [A]EP0272942  (BROOKES & GATEHOUSE [GB]) [A] 1,4,5,11 * column 6, line 26 - column 9, line 54; figures 3-5 *;
 [A]WO9714936  (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU], et al) [A] 1,4,5,11 * page 21, line 14 - page 24, line 37; figures 7-12 *;
 [A]US5792965  (BIGNELL NOEL [AU]) [A] 6* column 5, line 6 - line 39; figures 6,7 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.