Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020562

EP1020562 - Frog with movable point and its manufacturing process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  26.09.2003
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 12.11.2003  [2003/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COGIFER
40, Quai de l'Ecluse
78290 Croissy-Sur-Seine / FR
[2002/25]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
Comagep
5 Place Clément
67000 Strasbourg / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Testart, Gérard
5, Avenue de la Marguerite
78110 le Vesinet / FR
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Jacobson, Claude , et al
Cabinet Lavoix
2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/43]Jacobson, Claude , et al
Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2000/29]Farges, Roger , et al
c/o Cabinet Lavoix, 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date00400064.212.01.2000
[2000/29]
Priority number, dateFR1999000039815.01.1999         Original published format: FR 9900398
[2000/29]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1020562
Date:19.07.2000
Language:FR
[2000/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:E01B7/14
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/29]
TitleGerman:Herzstück mit beweglicher Spitze und dessen Herstellungsverfahren[2000/29]
English:Frog with movable point and its manufacturing process[2000/29]
French:Coeur de croisement à pointe mobile et procédé de fabrication d'un tel coeur de croisement[2000/29]
Examination procedure30.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
17.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
15.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XAY]EP0838552  (JEZ SISTEMAS FERROVIARIOS S L [ES]) [X] 1,6,8,10,11 * column 1, line 21 - line 25 * * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 6 * * column 4, line 38 - column 6, line 25; figure - * [A] 2-5,7,9,12,13 [Y] 14;
 [YA]US5042755  (TESTART GERARD [FR]) [Y] 14 * column W * [A] 1-6,8-13;
 [A]FR2263334  (PARIS & OUTREAU ACIERIES [FR]) [A] 1,6-8,10 * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 12; figure - *;
 [A]EP0143289  (SCHRECK MIEVES GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2700344  (COGIFER [FR]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *