Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1024070

EP1024070 - Modular set of railway coaches and railway train formed of such sets [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.10.2004
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 01.10.2008  [2008/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alstom
25, Avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
[2003/49]
Former [2000/31]For all designated states
Alstom
25 avenue Kleber
75116 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Devulder, Guy
18, rue Léon Blum
59 990 Estreux / FR
[2000/31]
Representative(s)de Lambilly Delorme, Marie Pierre , et al
ALSTOM
Legal Intellectual Property
3 avenue André Malraux
92309 Levallois Perret / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/37]de Lambilly Delorme, Marie Pierre , et al
ALSTOM Intellectual Property Department 25, Avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Former [2002/23]Gosse, Michel , et al
ALSTOM Intellectual Property Department 25,avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Former [2001/13]Hagel, Francis
Alstom Technologies, CIPD, 23/25, avenue Morane Saulnier
92360 Meudon La Forêt / FR
Former [2000/31]Gosse, Michel
ALSTOM Technology - C.I.P.D. 5, Avenue Newton
92142 Clamart Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date00400088.113.01.2000
[2000/31]
Priority number, dateFR1999000088527.01.1999         Original published format: FR 9900885
[2000/31]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1024070
Date:02.08.2000
Language:FR
[2000/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1024070
Date:03.12.2003
Language:FR
[2003/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:B61C3/00, B61D1/06, B61D3/10
[2000/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/31]
TitleGerman:Modulare Garnitur von Eisenbahnwagen und Eisenbahnzug aus solchen Garnituren[2000/31]
English:Modular set of railway coaches and railway train formed of such sets[2000/31]
French:Rame ferroviaire modulaire et convoi ferroviaire formé de telles rames[2000/31]
Examination procedure02.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/14]
26.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.2003Fee for grant paid
06.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY03.12.2003
IE03.12.2003
LU13.01.2004
FR31.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
GR03.03.2004
[2008/40]
Former [2007/08]CY03.12.2003
IE03.12.2003
LU13.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
GR03.03.2004
Former [2005/23]IE03.12.2003
LU13.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
GR03.03.2004
Former [2005/02]IE03.12.2003
MC31.01.2004
GR03.03.2004
Former [2004/40]IE03.12.2003
GR03.03.2004
Former [2004/33]GR03.03.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0631917  (SGP VERKEHRSTECHNIK) [A] 1,17 * column 4, line 55 - column 7, line 18; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE9411486U  (AMMENDORF WAGGONBAU) [A] 1,17 * page 4, line 13 - page 6, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0630789  (DUEWAG AG) [A] 1,17 * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 34; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]EP0578549  (GEC ALSTHOM TRANSPORT SA) [A] 5,6 * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 9; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0633173  (DUEWAG AG) [A] 5,6 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 24; figures 1,2 *
 [A]  - REVUE GÉNÉRALE DES CHEMINS DE FER, PARIS, (199711), pages 11 - 26, XP000732877 [A] 1,17 * figures 1,2 *