blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1031786

EP1031786 - Vehicle headlamp emitting two different light beams with a single light source [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.02.2008
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.04.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 07.05.2008  [2008/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VALEO VISION
34, rue Saint-André
93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/35]For all designated states
VALEO VISION
34, rue Saint-André
93012 Bobigny Cédex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Ravier, Jean Paul
15, avenue Galliéni
94100 Saint Maur / FR
02 / Montenegro, Cesar Lopez
c/o Valeo Vision, 34 rue Saint André
93012 Bobigny Cédex / FR
[2000/35]
Representative(s)Lemaire, Marc
Valeo Vision, 34 Rue Saint André
93012 Bobigny Cédex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/35]Lemaire, Marc
Valeo Vision, 34 Rue Saint André
93012 Bobigny Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date00400123.618.01.2000
[2000/35]
Priority number, dateFR1999000216122.02.1999         Original published format: FR 9902161
[2000/35]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1031786
Date:30.08.2000
Language:FR
[2000/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1031786
Date:28.03.2007
Language:FR
[2007/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.04.2000
ClassificationIPC:F21V14/04, B60Q1/068, F21W101/10
[2006/44]
CPC:
B60Q1/1415 (EP,US); F21S41/675 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/35]F21V14/04, B60Q1/068, // F21W101:10
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [2001/20]
Former [2000/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kraftfahrzeug-Scheinwerfer zur Erzeugung von zwei verschiedenen Lichtstrahlen mit einer einzigen Lichtquelle[2000/35]
English:Vehicle headlamp emitting two different light beams with a single light source[2000/35]
French:Projecteur de véhicule capable d'émettre deux faisceaux lumineux différents avec une source unique[2000/35]
Examination procedure26.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
27.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2007Fee for grant paid
14.02.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.01.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB28.03.2007
[2008/19]
Documents cited:Search[DYA]FR2765308  (VALEO VISION [FR]) [DY] 1,3,4,6,8,9 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 22 * * figure 1 * [A] 2,7;
 [Y]FR2432405  (MES SA [CH]) [Y] 1,3,4,6,8,9 * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 14 * * figures 1,2A,2B *;
 [A]FR2276195  (SEV MARCHAL [FR]) [A] 1,3,6 * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 11 * * figures 3,5,6 *;
 [A]EP0791780  (VALEO VISION [FR]) [A] 1,6,8,9 * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 16 * * figure 3 *
by applicantFR2765308
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.