Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1022343

EP1022343 - Process for purification of sugar juices and apparatus for carrying out this process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 21.02.2007  [2007/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAGUIN S.A.
2, rue Pierre Sémard
F-02800 Charmes / FR
[2000/30]
Inventor(s)01 / Guyot, Robert
16 Hameau de Bois Fontaine
78170 La Celle St. Cloud / FR
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Casalonga, Axel
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]Casalonga, Axel
BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date00400131.919.01.2000
[2000/30]
Priority number, dateFR1999000065121.01.1999         Original published format: FR 9900651
[2000/30]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1022343
Date:26.07.2000
Language:FR
[2000/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1022343
Date:25.06.2003
Language:FR
[2003/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:C13D3/06, C13D3/02
[2000/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/30]
Extension statesAL27.01.2000
LT27.01.2000
LV27.01.2000
MK27.01.2000
RO27.01.2000
SI27.01.2000
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Reinigung von Zuckersäften und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens[2000/30]
English:Process for purification of sugar juices and apparatus for carrying out this process[2000/30]
French:Procédé d'épuration d'un jus sucré et installation de mise en oeuvre du procédé[2000/30]
Examination procedure31.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
19.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2003Fee for grant paid
17.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY25.06.2003
IE25.06.2003
PT25.09.2003
LU19.01.2004
CH31.01.2004
LI31.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
[2007/08]
Former [2005/23]IE25.06.2003
PT25.09.2003
LU19.01.2004
CH31.01.2004
LI31.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
Former [2005/02]IE25.06.2003
PT25.09.2003
CH31.01.2004
LI31.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
Former [2004/51]IE25.06.2003
PT25.09.2003
CH31.01.2004
LI31.01.2004
Former [2004/29]IE25.06.2003
PT25.09.2003
Former [2004/13]PT25.09.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]US4795494  (TOTH LASZLO [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * figure .; claim - *;
 [A]US5480490  (TOTH LASZLO [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * figure .; claim - *;
 [A]EP0550786  (LIMEX [CS]) [A] 1-8 * figure 1; claim - *;
 [A]FR1553443  (RAFFINERIE TIRLEMONTOISE) [A] 1-8 * Résumé*;; figure . *