blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1030158

EP1030158 - Electric pyrotechnic igniter with integrated electronics [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.09.2003
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 22.07.2009  [2009/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LIVBAG S.N.C.
2, rue Villaret de Joyeuse
75017 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/15]For all designated states
Livbag S.N.C.
2, rue Villaret de Joyeuse
75017 Paris / FR
Former [2000/34]For all designated states
Livbag SNC
Centre de Recherches du Bouchet, Rue Lavoisier
91710 Vert le Petit / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Duguet, Jean-René
44, rue Charles Gabel
95470 Survilliers / FR
02 / Vedel, Jean-Pierre
18, rue de la Liberté
95470 Survilliers / FR
[2000/34]
Representative(s)Le Faou, Daniel, et al
Cabinet Regimbeau
Espace Performance
Bâtiment K
35769 Saint-Gregoire Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/30]Le Faou, Daniel, et al
Cabinet Regimbeau Espace Performance Bâtiment K
35769 Saint-Gregoire Cedex / FR
Former [2003/13]Le Faou, Daniel, et al
Cabinet Regimbeau Espace Performance Bâtiment K
35769 Saint-Gregoire-Cedex / FR
Former [2000/34]Pech, Bernard
SNPE - Service Propriété Industrielle 12, Quai Henri IV
75181 Paris Cédex 04 / FR
Application number, filing date00400194.726.01.2000
[2000/34]
Priority number, dateFR1999000194918.02.1999         Original published format: FR 9901949
[2000/34]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1030158
Date:23.08.2000
Language:FR
[2000/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1030158
Date:30.10.2002
Language:FR
[2002/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.2000
ClassificationIPC:F42B3/12
[2000/34]
CPC:
F42B3/121 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/34]
TitleGerman:Elektrischer, pyrotechnischer Anzünder mit integrierter Elektronik[2002/27]
English:Electric pyrotechnic igniter with integrated electronics[2000/34]
French:Allumeur électro-pyrotechnique à électronique integrée[2000/34]
Former [2000/34]Elektrischer, pyrortechnischer Anzünder mit integrierter Elektronik
Examination procedure19.05.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/17]
15.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
27.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
16.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.08.2002Fee for grant paid
26.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.10.2002
FI30.10.2002
GR30.10.2002
IE30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
CY26.01.2003
LU26.01.2003
DK30.01.2003
PT30.01.2003
BE31.01.2003
MC31.01.2003
[2007/10]
Former [2005/02]AT30.10.2002
FI30.10.2002
GR30.10.2002
IE30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
CY26.01.2003
LU26.01.2003
PT30.01.2003
BE31.01.2003
MC31.01.2003
Former [2004/44]AT30.10.2002
FI30.10.2002
GR30.10.2002
IE30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
CY26.01.2003
LU26.01.2003
PT30.01.2003
BE31.01.2003
Former [2004/39]AT30.10.2002
FI30.10.2002
GR30.10.2002
IE30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
LU26.01.2003
PT30.01.2003
BE31.01.2003
Former [2004/28]AT30.10.2002
FI30.10.2002
GR30.10.2002
IE30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
PT30.01.2003
BE31.01.2003
Former [2003/43]AT30.10.2002
FI30.10.2002
GR30.10.2002
IE30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
PT30.01.2003
Former [2003/42]AT30.10.2002
GR30.10.2002
IE30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
PT30.01.2003
Former [2003/37]AT30.10.2002
GR30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
PT30.01.2003
Former [2003/31]GR30.10.2002
NL30.10.2002
PT30.01.2003
Former [2003/30]NL30.10.2002
PT30.01.2003
Former [2003/29]PT30.01.2003
Documents cited:Search[Y]US3999484  (EVANS JOHN H) [Y] 9,10 * column 4, lines 13-17 *;
 [A]FR2672675  (DAVEY BICKFORD [FR]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 6 - page 8, line 30 *;
 [A]EP0520360  (EXPERT EXPLOSIVES [ZA]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 47; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0555651  (NITRO NOBEL AB [SE]) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 12-33; figure 4 * * column 17, lines 28-45 * * column 20, lines 19-22 *;
 [DY]FR2704944  (NCS PYROTECHNIE TECHNOLOGIES [FR]) [DY] 8 * page 5, lines 28-31; claim 5 *;
 [A]FR2710404  (DAVEY BICKFORD [FR]);
 [Y]EP0717259  (ALTECH IND PTY LTD [ZA]) [Y] 3,5,6 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 54; figures 1-3 *;
 [XY]WO9721067  (EXPERT EXPLOSIVES [ZA], et al) [X] 1,2,4,11-13 * page 1, lines 21-32; figures 2,3 * * page 6, line 31 - page 10, line 16 * [Y] 3,5-10;
 [Y]WO9825100  (INT RESISTIVE CO [US]) [Y] 7-10 * abstract *;
 [DA]FR2760525  (LIVBAG SNC [FR]) [DA] 9 * page 6, lines 12-22; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE19721839  (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE])
by applicantFR2704944
 US5544585
 FR2760525
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.