Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1039070

EP1039070 - Actuating fitting for a sliding wing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.02.2006
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.2009Change - representativepublished on 01.07.2009  [2009/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ferco International Ferrures et Serrures de Bâtiment
2, rue du Vieux Moulin 57445 Réding
Sarrebourg / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
Ferco International Ferrures et Serrures de Bâtiment
2, rue du Vieux Moulin
57445 Réding, Sarrebourg / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Supernat, Thierry
34, rue Robert Schuman
57670 Nebing / FR
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain , et al
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
4A, rue de l'Industrie
67450 Mundolsheim / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/27]Rhein, Alain , et al
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein 17 Rue de la Forêt
67550 Vendenheim / FR
Former [2004/48]Rhein, Alain , et al
c/o Cabinet Bleger-Rhein, 8, Avenue Pierre Mendès France
67300 Schiltigheim / FR
Former [2003/29]Keib, Gérard , et al
Pontet Allano & Associés S.E.L.A.R.L. 6 avenue du Général de Gaulle
78000 Versailles / FR
Former [2002/10]Keib, Gérard , et al
Cabinet Gérard Keib L'ESPACE CRISTAL 22, rue Gustave Eiffel Technoparc
78306 Poissy Cédex / FR
Former [2000/39]Rémont, Claude , et al
NOVAMARK TECHNOLOGIES, 122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois Perret / FR
Application number, filing date00400321.604.02.2000
[2000/39]
Priority number, dateFR1999000359923.03.1999         Original published format: FR 9903599
[2000/39]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1039070
Date:27.09.2000
Language:FR
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1039070
Date:20.04.2005
Language:FR
[2005/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:E05B9/08, E05B65/08
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/39]
TitleGerman:Betätigungsbeschlag für einen Schiebeflügel[2000/39]
English:Actuating fitting for a sliding wing[2000/39]
French:Ferrure de commande pour un ouvrant coulissant[2000/39]
Examination procedure11.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/45]
10.01.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.2004Fee for grant paid
28.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
16.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
17.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.04.2005
CY20.04.2005
FI20.04.2005
IE20.04.2005
NL20.04.2005
DK20.07.2005
GR20.07.2005
SE20.07.2005
PT20.09.2005
[2009/02]
Former [2006/23]AT20.04.2005
FI20.04.2005
IE20.04.2005
NL20.04.2005
DK20.07.2005
GR20.07.2005
SE20.07.2005
PT20.09.2005
Former [2006/14]AT20.04.2005
FI20.04.2005
NL20.04.2005
DK20.07.2005
GR20.07.2005
SE20.07.2005
PT20.09.2005
Former [2006/13]AT20.04.2005
FI20.04.2005
DK20.07.2005
SE20.07.2005
Former [2005/52]FI20.04.2005
SE20.07.2005
Former [2005/50]SE20.07.2005
Documents cited:Search[DA]FR2761719  (FERCO INT USINE FERRURES [FR]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE1428516  (FLIETHER FA KARL) [A] 1,2,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4570471  (CREPINSEK ALOIS [US]) [A] 1,2,4,6 * figures 1-9 *;
 [A]DE29620880U  (SCHNEIDER FRANZ BRAKEL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE2449741  (FLIETHER FA KARL) [A] 1,6 * figures 1-8 *;
 [A]FR2518628  (GEZE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6 * figures 1-8 *