Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1044625

EP1044625 - Applying capsule and applicator assembly with such a capsule [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.08.2007
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, LU
published on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2006/41]For all designated states
L'ORÉAL
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2000/42]For all designated states
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Gueret, Jean-Louis H.
27, avenue Raymond Poincaré
75016 Paris / FR
[2000/42]
Representative(s)Boulard, Denis
L'Oréal
Service DIPI
9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus
92110 Clichy / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/42]Boulard, Denis
L'OREAL-DPI 6 rue Bertrand Sincholle
92585 Clichy Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date00400488.323.02.2000
[2000/42]
Priority number, dateFR1999000481616.04.1999         Original published format: FR 9904816
[2000/42]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1044625
Date:18.10.2000
Language:FR
[2000/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1044625
Date:11.10.2006
Language:FR
[2006/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:A45D34/04, A45D33/00, B65D83/14
[2000/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/42]
TitleGerman:Applikationskapsel und Applikationseinheit mit einem solchen Kapsel[2000/42]
English:Applying capsule and applicator assembly with such a capsule[2000/42]
French:Capsule applicatrice et ensemble d'application équipé d'une telle capsule applicatrice[2000/42]
Examination procedure18.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/25]
07.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2006Fee for grant paid
21.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.07.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
14.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.10.2006
CY11.10.2006
FI11.10.2006
IE11.10.2006
NL11.10.2006
DK11.01.2007
SE11.01.2007
GR12.01.2007
LU23.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT19.03.2007
[2009/37]
Former [2008/19]AT11.10.2006
FI11.10.2006
IE11.10.2006
NL11.10.2006
DK11.01.2007
SE11.01.2007
GR12.01.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT19.03.2007
Former [2008/04]AT11.10.2006
FI11.10.2006
IE11.10.2006
NL11.10.2006
DK11.01.2007
SE11.01.2007
BE28.02.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT19.03.2007
Former [2007/48]AT11.10.2006
FI11.10.2006
IE11.10.2006
IT11.10.2006
NL11.10.2006
DK11.01.2007
SE11.01.2007
CH28.02.2007
LI28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT19.03.2007
Former [2007/42]AT11.10.2006
FI11.10.2006
IE11.10.2006
IT11.10.2006
NL11.10.2006
DK11.01.2007
SE11.01.2007
PT19.03.2007
Former [2007/37]AT11.10.2006
FI11.10.2006
IT11.10.2006
NL11.10.2006
DK11.01.2007
SE11.01.2007
PT19.03.2007
Former [2007/35]AT11.10.2006
FI11.10.2006
IT11.10.2006
NL11.10.2006
SE11.01.2007
PT19.03.2007
Former [2007/28]AT11.10.2006
FI11.10.2006
NL11.10.2006
SE11.01.2007
PT19.03.2007
Former [2007/26]FI11.10.2006
NL11.10.2006
SE11.01.2007
PT19.03.2007
Former [2007/25]FI11.10.2006
NL11.10.2006
SE11.01.2007
Former [2007/19]NL11.10.2006
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP0374339  (ARTEBEL SA [ES]) [Y] 1-3,6,11-13,17 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 3; figure 3 * [A] 14;
 [Y]EP0263329  (ROTRING WERKE RIEPE KG [DE]) [Y] 1-3,6,11-13,17 * column 6, line 20 - line 25; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]FR2633498  (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]FR2588457  (CHEN TENG MO [TW]) [A] 1,6,7 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]FR2744602  (OREAL [FR]) [A] 4,5 * figures 3,4 *;
 [A]US3266079  (GILBERT SCHWARTZMAN) [A] 6,8,9 * column W *;
 [A]US3345673  (GILBERT SCHWARTZMAN) [A] 10 * figures 3,4 *;
 [A]WO9112197  (CP PACKAGING INC [US])