Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035081

EP1035081 - Process for manufacturing an optical fibre preform by external deposition of silica, optionally doped [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.06.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[2000/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Ripoche, Pierre
2, Avenue Marcel Denon
45300 Pithiviers / FR
02 / Drouart, Alain
2 avenue Félix Faure
92000 Nanterre / FR
03 / Gouez, Benoit
17 Place du 14 Juillet
78260 Acheres / FR
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Lamoureux, Bernard
Alcatel Lucent
Intellectual Property & Standards
54 Rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Lamoureux, Bernard
COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété industrielle 30, avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date00400560.902.03.2000
[2000/37]
Priority number, dateFR1999000281508.03.1999         Original published format: FR 9902815
[2000/37]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1035081
Date:13.09.2000
Language:FR
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1035081
Date:21.08.2002
Language:FR
[2002/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:C03B37/012, C03B37/014
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/37]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Vorform für optische Fasern durch Aussenabscheidung von gegebenfalls dotiertem Siliciumoxid[2000/37]
English:Process for manufacturing an optical fibre preform by external deposition of silica, optionally doped[2000/37]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'une préforme de fibre optique avec depot externe de silice éventuellement dopée[2000/37]
Examination procedure13.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/19]
01.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2002Fee for grant paid
28.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.08.2002
FI21.08.2002
GR21.08.2002
IE21.08.2002
NL21.08.2002
DK21.11.2002
SE21.11.2002
PT05.12.2002
CY02.03.2003
LU02.03.2003
BE31.03.2003
MC31.03.2003
[2005/02]
Former [2005/01]AT21.08.2002
FI21.08.2002
GR21.08.2002
IE21.08.2002
NL21.08.2002
DK21.11.2002
SE21.11.2002
PT05.12.2002
CY02.03.2003
LU02.03.2003
BE31.03.2003
Former [2004/44]AT21.08.2002
FI21.08.2002
GR21.08.2002
IE21.08.2002
NL21.08.2002
DK21.11.2002
PT05.12.2002
CY02.03.2003
LU02.03.2003
BE31.03.2003
Former [2004/39]AT21.08.2002
FI21.08.2002
GR21.08.2002
IE21.08.2002
NL21.08.2002
DK21.11.2002
PT05.12.2002
LU02.03.2003
BE31.03.2003
Former [2004/28]AT21.08.2002
FI21.08.2002
GR21.08.2002
IE21.08.2002
NL21.08.2002
DK21.11.2002
PT05.12.2002
BE31.03.2003
Former [2003/45]AT21.08.2002
FI21.08.2002
GR21.08.2002
IE21.08.2002
NL21.08.2002
DK21.11.2002
PT05.12.2002
Former [2003/42]AT21.08.2002
FI21.08.2002
GR21.08.2002
IE21.08.2002
NL21.08.2002
PT05.12.2002
Former [2003/31]AT21.08.2002
FI21.08.2002
GR21.08.2002
NL21.08.2002
PT05.12.2002
Former [2003/22]FI21.08.2002
GR21.08.2002
NL21.08.2002
PT05.12.2002
Former [2003/20]FI21.08.2002
GR21.08.2002
NL21.08.2002
Former [2003/14]FI21.08.2002
NL21.08.2002
Former [2003/07]NL21.08.2002
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0719738  (ALCATEL NV [NL], et al) [DA] 1 * figure 1; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]FR2446264  (QUARTZ & SILICE) [A] 1 * page 6, line 11 - line 23; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0875489  (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claims 1-5 *;
 [DA]EP0440130  (ALCATEL FIBRES OPTIQUES [FR]);
 [DA]EP0450465  (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR])