Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037480

EP1037480 - Method for detecting frequency locking signals, and mobile telephone therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.09.2003  [2003/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sagem SA
27 rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/43]For all designated states
SAGEM S.A.
27, rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
SAGEM S.A.
6, Avenue d'Iéna
75116 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Romao, Fernando
58, Quai Georges Sand
78360 Montesson / FR
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie
SCHMIT CHRETIEN
8, Place du Ponceau
95000 Cergy / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie
Cabinet Christian Schmit et Associes, 8, place du Ponceau
95000 Cergy / FR
Application number, filing date00400615.107.03.2000
[2000/38]
Priority number, dateFR1999000338418.03.1999         Original published format: FR 9903384
[2000/38]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1037480
Date:20.09.2000
Language:FR
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1037480
Date:18.09.2002
Language:FR
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/32, H04B7/26, H04B1/16
[2002/11]
Former International [2000/38]H04Q7/32, H04B7/26, H04B1/16, H03J7/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   GB,   SE [2001/23]
Former [2000/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Detektion von Frequenzverriegelungsignalen, und mobiles Telefon dafür[2000/38]
English:Method for detecting frequency locking signals, and mobile telephone therefor[2000/38]
French:Procédé de détection de signaux de calage en fréquence, et téléphone mobile correspondant[2000/38]
Examination procedure03.03.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
05.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
12.03.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
28.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.05.2002Fee for grant paid
04.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
[2003/14]
Documents cited:Search[X]US5027428  (ISHIGURO KAZUHISA [JP], et al) [X] 1,7 * column 2, line 5 - line 63 *;
 [A]EP0717512  (AT & T CORP [US]);
 [A]US5390216  (BILITZA HERBERT [DE], et al)