Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037205

EP1037205 - Optical recording/reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.11.2008
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.12.2008  [2008/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kobayashi, Hajime
c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Audier, Philippe André , et al
BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/02]Audier, Philippe André , et al
Brevalex, 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2000/38]Des Termes, Monique , et al
c/o Société de Protection des Inventions 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date00400625.008.03.2000
[2000/38]
Priority number, dateJP1999006247910.03.1999         Original published format: JP 6247999
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1037205
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1037205
Date:10.01.2001
[2001/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:G11B7/125
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesFR,   NL [2001/45]
Former [2001/39]AT,  BE 
Former [2000/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Optisches Aufzeichnungs-/ Wiedergabegerät[2000/38]
English:Optical recording/reproducing apparatus[2000/38]
French:Appareil d'enregistrement / de reproduction optique[2000/38]
Examination procedure30.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/35]
11.07.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
13.12.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
08.02.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/50]
25.07.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2008/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
21.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
20.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
21.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.09.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200809   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5477557  (INABA NAOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 61; figure 4 * * column 6, line 62 - column 9, line 24; figures 6,7 *;
 [A]US5712839  (AOKI IKUO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 4, line 15 - column 7, line 61 *;
 [A]US5768245  (MAEDA MIYOZO [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 10, line 33 - column 11, line 44 *;
 [A]US5745463  (MAEGAWA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 19, line 6 - column 23, line 4 *;
 [A]US5495463  (AKAGI TOSHIYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 9, line 45 - column 13, line 4 *