Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1078611

EP1078611 - System for deployment of an intravascular prosthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/09]Intravascular prosthesis and system for deployment of same
[2003/41]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  22.06.2007
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novatech SA
144, Chemin de Saint-Marc
06130 Grasse le Plan / FR
[2001/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Fedida, José
483 Chemin des Adrets
06370 Mouans-Sartoux / FR
 [2001/09]
Representative(s)Hauer, Bernard
Gevers France
41, avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/09]Hauer, Bernard
Cabinet Bonnétat 29, Rue de Saint-Pétersbourg
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date00400710.015.03.2000
[2001/09]
Priority number, dateFR1999001073324.08.1999         Original published format: FR 9910733
[2001/09]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1078611
Date:28.02.2001
Language:FR
[2001/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1078611
Date:09.06.2004
Language:FR
[2004/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP04.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/06
[2001/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/09]
TitleGerman:Anbringungssystem für eine intravaskuläre Prothese[2003/41]
English:System for deployment of an intravascular prosthesis[2003/41]
French:Système de mise en place d'une prothèse intravasculaire[2003/41]
Former [2001/09]Intravaskuläre Prothese sowie Anbringungssystem dafür
Former [2001/09]Intravascular prosthesis and system for deployment of same
Former [2001/09]Prothèse intravasculaire et système de mise en place de cette prothèse
Examination procedure16.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/29]
24.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.03.2004Fee for grant paid
11.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.03.2005  18.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
C.R. BARD INC.
730 Central Avenue
US-New Jersey 07974, Murray Hill / US
Opponent's representative
Marsh, Roy David
Hoffmann Eitle
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2005/18]
Opponent(s)01  09.03.2005  18.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
C.R. BARD INC.
730 Central Avenue
US-New Jersey 07974, Murray Hill / US
Opponent's representative
Marsh, Roy David
Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
13.04.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.08.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.08.2005Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
20.02.2006Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
31.01.2007Date of oral proceedings
08.03.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.03.2007Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
18.03.2007Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI09.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
NL09.06.2004
DK09.09.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
ES20.09.2004
PT09.11.2004
CY15.03.2005
LU15.03.2005
BE31.03.2005
CH31.03.2005
LI31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
FR30.11.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/26]FI09.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
NL09.06.2004
DK09.09.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
ES20.09.2004
CY15.03.2005
LU15.03.2005
BE31.03.2005
CH31.03.2005
LI31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
FR30.11.2005
Former [2007/20]FI09.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
NL09.06.2004
DK09.09.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
ES20.09.2004
CY15.03.2005
BE31.03.2005
CH31.03.2005
LI31.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
FR30.11.2005
Former [2007/08]FI09.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
NL09.06.2004
DK09.09.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
ES20.09.2004
BE31.03.2005
CH31.03.2005
LI31.03.2005
LU31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
FR30.11.2005
Former [2006/14]FI09.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
NL09.06.2004
DK09.09.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
ES20.09.2004
BE31.03.2005
CH31.03.2005
LI31.03.2005
MC31.03.2005
FR30.11.2005
Former [2006/13]FI09.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
NL09.06.2004
DK09.09.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
ES20.09.2004
BE31.03.2005
Former [2005/23]FI09.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
DK09.09.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
ES20.09.2004
Former [2005/22]FI09.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
DK09.09.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
Former [2005/19]FI09.06.2004
IE09.06.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
Former [2005/06]FI09.06.2004
GR09.09.2004
SE09.09.2004
Former [2005/02]FI09.06.2004
SE09.09.2004
Former [2004/52]SE09.09.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]US5534007  (ST GERMAIN JON P [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * column W *;
 [A]EP0536610  (ANGIOMED AG [DE]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0418677  (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE29717110U  (OPTIMED MEDIZINISCHE INSTR GMB [DE]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *