Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1052524

EP1052524 - Bichromatic optical cell [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.12.2003  [2003/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS
89 boulevard Franklin Roosevelt
92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/33]For all designated states
Schneider Electric Industries SAS
89, boulevard Franklin Roosevelt
92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
Former [2002/32]For all designated states
Schneider Electronic Industries SAS
89, boulevard Franklin Roosevelt
92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
Schneider Electric Industries SA
89 boulevard Franklin Roosevelt
92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Guillot, Alain, Ing.
14 Rue Lamartine
16730 Fleac / FR
02 / Couillaud, Frédéric, Ing.
124, Rue de Périgueux
16000 Angouleme / FR
[2000/46]
Application number, filing date00400716.715.03.2000
[2000/46]
Priority number, dateFR1999000522423.04.1999         Original published format: FR 9905224
[2000/46]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1052524
Date:15.11.2000
Language:FR
[2000/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1052524
Date:18.12.2002
Language:FR
[2002/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01V8/14
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   LI [2001/31]
Former [2000/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bichromatische optische Zelle[2000/46]
English:Bichromatic optical cell[2000/46]
French:Cellule optique bichromatique[2000/46]
Examination procedure13.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/06]
29.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.10.2002Fee for grant paid
14.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0329083  (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [DA] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]DE29711259U  (SICK AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4649270  (GOLDENBERG LOUIS [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 42 - line 49 *;
 [A]EP0005852  (SICK OPTIK ELEKTRONIK ERWIN [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [PA]EP0923140  (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA [FR]) [PA] 1 * claims 1,2 *