EP1046547 - System for protecting the lower limbs of a motor vehicle occupant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SNPE Matériaux Energétiques 12, Quai Henri IV 75004 Paris / FR | [2004/27] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states SNPE 12, Quai Henri IV 75181 Paris Cedex 04 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gautier, Philippe 8, rue des Glycines 91220 Le Plessis Pate / FR | 02 /
Maudet, Natacha 73, rue Rivay 92300 Levallois Perret / FR | 03 /
Delarue, Jean-Jacques 10, rue Sadi Lecointe 78140 Vélizy / FR | 04 /
Obry, Cédric 6, rue Roger 95430 Auvers sur Oise / FR | [2000/43] | Application number, filing date | 00400867.8 | 29.03.2000 | [2000/43] | Priority number, date | FR19990004972 | 20.04.1999 Original published format: FR 9904972 | [2000/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1046547 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1046547 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/02, F15B15/19, F15B15/22 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
F15B15/19 (EP);
B60R21/02 (EP);
B60R2021/0051 (EP);
B60R2021/024 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/43] | Title | German: | System zum Schützen der unteren Gliedmassen eines Kraftfahrzeug-Insassens | [2000/43] | English: | System for protecting the lower limbs of a motor vehicle occupant | [2000/43] | French: | Système de protection des membres inférieurs d'un occupant d'un véhicule automobile | [2000/43] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 13.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.02.2005 | FI | 09.02.2005 | IE | 09.02.2005 | NL | 09.02.2005 | CY | 29.03.2005 | LU | 29.03.2005 | BE | 31.03.2005 | CH | 31.03.2005 | LI | 31.03.2005 | MC | 31.03.2005 | DK | 09.05.2005 | GR | 09.05.2005 | PT | 09.07.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
CY | 29.03.2005 | ||
LU | 29.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
CH | 31.03.2005 | ||
LI | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
CY | 29.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
CH | 31.03.2005 | ||
LI | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
LU | 09.04.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
CH | 31.03.2005 | ||
LI | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
LU | 09.04.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
CH | 31.03.2005 | ||
LI | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.02.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
CH | 31.03.2005 | ||
LI | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.02.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 09.02.2005 | |
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 09.02.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3389873 (FILIPPI ERNEST A, et al) [A] 1,5,13* column 3, line 59 - column 7, line 57; figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE2258063 (OPEL ADAM AG) [A] 1,2,9-11,13 * page 26, paragraph 2 - page 28, paragraph 1; figures 6-8 * * page 31, line 24 - line 26 *; | [A]US3871470 (SCHWANZ WILFRIED, et al) [A] 1,5,13 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 25; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US3901531 (PROCHAZKA ARTHUR) [A] 1,5,9,13 * column 1, line 14 - column 2, line 18 * * column 3, line 4 - line 34; figure 3 *; | [YA]US4198075 (BIELMEIER HEINZ [DE], et al) [Y] 1,9 * column 4, line 20 - line 27; figure 7 * * column 4, line 28 - line 37; figure 8 * [A] 2; | [A]US4423846 (FOEHL ARTUR [DE]) [A] 1,5,13 * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 12; figure 12 *; | [YX]US4458921 (CHIBA MASAKAZU [JP], et al) [Y] 1,9 * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 32; figure - * [X] 13; | [XA]EP0186880 (AUTOFLUG GMBH [DE]) [X] 13 * page 8, paragraph 6 - page 10, paragraph 2; figures 1,2; claims 1,6,7,19 * [A] 1,9 |