Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1043337

EP1043337 - Powdered corn-steep [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  09.11.2012
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2012Refusal of applicationpublished on 12.12.2012  [2012/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Roquette Frères
62136 Lestrem / FR
[2000/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Erpicum, Thomas
73, Rue de la Jeunesse
Seraing, Liège 4100 / BE
02 / Saniez, Marie-Hélène
35, Rue Suzanne Lannoy Blin
59350 Saint Andre / FR
[2000/41]
Representative(s)Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/36]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2000/41]Boulinguiez, Didier
Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date00400935.305.04.2000
[2000/41]
Priority number, dateFR1999000439208.04.1999         Original published format: FR 9904392
[2000/41]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1043337
Date:11.10.2000
Language:FR
[2000/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP19.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08B30/10, C12N1/14, C12N1/16, C12N1/20
[2000/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/41]
TitleGerman:Pulverförmiges Cornsteep[2000/41]
English:Powdered corn-steep[2000/41]
French:Corn-steep pulverulent[2000/41]
Examination procedure16.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
05.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.07.2012
19.07.2012Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
30.07.2012Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/50]
09.08.2012Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/50]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.11.2004
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
24.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
20.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
27.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
22.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:SearchCS159853  [ ] (CZECH.);
 JPH10338584  [ ] (KOUNOSHIMA KASEI KK);
 [A]JPS6075240
 [X]  - "Powdered feed from corn", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19760524), vol. 84, no. 21, Database accession no. 149585, XP002123147 [X] 1-4 * abstract *
 [A]  - "Solid fertilizers and soil amendments containing corn steep liquor and their manufacture", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19990215), vol. 130, no. 7, Database accession no. 81008, XP002123148 [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850822), vol. 009, no. 205, Database accession no. (C - 299), [A] * abstract *