Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1148727

EP1148727 - Method and device for decoding a digital video stream in a digital video system using dummy header insertion [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.02.2003
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.04.2003  [2003/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THOMSON multimedia
46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
[2001/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Rabu, Christophe
Thomson Multimedia, 46 quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR
02 / Abelard, Franck
Thomson Multimedia, 46 quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR
03 / Leyendecker, Philippe
Thomson Multimedia, 46 quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR
 [2001/43]
Representative(s)Kohrs, Martin , et al
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/43]Kohrs, Martin , et al
Thomson multimedia 46, quai A. Le Gallo
92648 Boulogne-Billancourt Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date00400941.105.04.2000
[2001/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1148727
Date:24.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/24
[2001/43]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/29]
Former [2001/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Dekodierung von digitalen Videosignalen in einem digitalen Fernsehsystem unter Verwendung von Scheinheadereinfügung[2001/43]
English:Method and device for decoding a digital video stream in a digital video system using dummy header insertion[2001/43]
French:Méthode et appareil pour décoder un signal vidéo numérique dans un système de vidéo numérique avec insertion d'entêtes factices[2001/43]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/14]
27.09.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/14]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.06.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
12.06.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200203   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0711083  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-7,11,12 * page 4, column 6, line 16 - line 44 *;
 [X]WO9832284  (NDS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-6,11,12 * page 4, line 6 - line 21 * * page 7, line 11 - line 18 *;
 [A]EP0748129  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 9, line 41 - line 50 *