Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1053980

EP1053980 - Low emissivity glass, glass articles made of low emissivity glass, and method of manufacturing low emissivity glass [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.07.2003
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.08.2003  [2003/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd.
5-11, Dosho-machi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0045 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd.
5-11, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Norimatsu, Hodaka c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd.
5-11, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka, 541-0045 / JP
[2000/47]
Representative(s)Uchida, Kenji , et al
Fédit-Loriot
38, avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]Uchida, Kenji , et al
S.A. Fedit-Loriot et Autres Conseils en Propriété Industrielle, 38, avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date00401123.521.04.2000
[2000/47]
Priority number, dateJP1999011476022.04.1999         Original published format: JP 11476099
JP1999031665608.11.1999         Original published format: JP 31665699
[2000/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1053980
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP25.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:C03C17/34
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesGB [2001/32]
Former [2000/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Glas mit niedriger Emissivität, Gegenstände aus Glas mit niedriger Emissivität und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Glases mit niedriger Emissivität[2000/47]
English:Low emissivity glass, glass articles made of low emissivity glass, and method of manufacturing low emissivity glass[2000/47]
French:Verre de faible émissivité, articles en verre de faible émissivité et procédé de préparation de verre de faible émissivité[2000/47]
Examination procedure22.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/29]
01.08.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/34]
18.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0983972  (ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA ELF [US]) [PX] 1,11,13,15-25 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5332888  (TAUSCH PETER J [US], et al) [X] 1,11,15,22-25 * column 4, line 4 - line 55 * * examples III,IV *;
 [X]US5780149  (MCCURDY RICHARD J [US], et al) [X] 1-4,11-15,22-25 * column 1, line 22 - line 28 * * column 4, line 25 - line 35 * * column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 15 * * Predictive Example I * * claims 2,18 *;
 [X]EP0526966  (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * page 2, line 37 - line 40 * * example 1 *;
 [X]US5776603  (ZAGDOUN GEORGES [FR], et al) [X] 1,6-15,22-25 * column 1, line 21 - line 41 * * column 6, line 39 - line 67 * * column 7, line 48 - line 62 * * column 8, line 57 - column 9, line 12 *;
 [X]US5520996  (BALIAN PIERRE [FR], et al) [X] 1,6-15,22-25 * column 6, line 20 - line 60 * * column 7, line 34 - line 42 *;
 [X]US5304394  (SAUVINET VINCENT M [DK], et al) [X] 1,6-15,22-25 * column 5, line 28 - column 6, line 59 *;
 [X]GB2302102  (GLAVERBEL [BE]) [X] 8-10,16-21 * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 27 *;
 [X]  - STJEMA B ET AL, "Optical and electrical properties of radio frequency sputtered tin oxide films doped with oxygen vacancies, F, Sb, or Mo", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, (19940915), vol. 76, no. 6, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 3797 - 3817, XP002140560 [X] 8-10,16-21 * page 3799, column R, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 3802, column R, paragraph L - page 3803, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 3804, column R, paragraph L - page 3805, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 3806, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 3807, column R, paragraph 2 - page 3808, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 3814, column R, paragraph L - page 3816, column R, paragraph L * * figures 6,7,9,10,12,13,26 * * tables I-IV *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.357383