Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1052201

EP1052201 - Suction gripper [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 15.10.2008  [2008/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Joulin, Michel
11 rue de Villemartin
91150 Morigny / FR
[2000/46]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/46]
Representative(s)Fruchard, Guy , et al
Cabinet Boettcher
16, Rue Médéric
75017 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/42]Fruchard, Guy , et al
Cabinet Boettcher 22, rue du Général Foy
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2000/46]Fruchard, Guy , et al
Cabinet Patco, 22 rue du Général Foy
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date00401212.603.05.2000
[2000/46]
Priority number, dateFR1999000585107.05.1999         Original published format: FR 9905851
[2000/46]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1052201
Date:15.11.2000
Language:FR
[2000/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1052201
Date:03.03.2004
Language:FR
[2004/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:B65G47/91
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/46]
TitleGerman:Sauggreifer[2000/46]
English:Suction gripper[2000/46]
French:Tête de préhension par aspiration[2000/46]
Examination procedure10.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/24]
26.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.2003Fee for grant paid
22.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
IT03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
LU03.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
PT03.08.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/35]CY03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
IT03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
LU03.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2007/08]CY03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
LU03.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2005/23]FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
LU03.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2005/18]FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK03.06.2004
GR03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2005/11]FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
MC31.05.2004
GR03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2005/05]FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
NL03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2005/03]FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2004/46]FI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
ES14.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI03.03.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2640600  (JOULIN AERO DISTRIBUTION SARL [FR]) [A] 1-4 * page 7, line 18 - page 9, line 29; figure 3 *;
 [A]US4674785  (RIESENBERG MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1-4 * column 4, line 7 - column 6, line 62; figure - *