Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1053746

EP1053746 - Use of biodegradable microspheres for the delivery of a anticancer agent for the treatment of glioblastoma [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.11.2003  [2003/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Laboratoires des Produits Ethiques Ethypharm
21, Rue Saint-Mathieu
78550 Houdan / FR
[2000/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Faisant, Nathalie
Lieu-dit Miga, route de Louvaines
49220 Montreuil sur Maine / FR
02 / Benoit, Jean-Pierre
45 allée des Chataigniers
49240 Avrille / FR
03 / Menei, Philippe
5 avenue Emile Savigner
49240 Avrille / FR
 [2001/09]
Former [2000/47]01 / Faisant, Nathalie
Lieu-dit Miga, route de Louvaines
49220 Montreuil sur Maine / FR
02 / Benoit, Jean-Pierre
45 allée des Chataigniers
49240 Avrille / FR
03 / Menet, Philippe
5 avenue Emile Savigner
49240 Avrille / FR
Representative(s)Ahner, Francis , et al
Cabinet Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]Ahner, Francis , et al
CABINET REGIMBEAU 26, avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date00401344.717.05.2000
[2000/47]
Priority number, dateFR1999000620717.05.1999         Original published format: FR 9906207
[2000/47]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1053746
Date:22.11.2000
Language:FR
[2000/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1053746
Date:27.11.2002
Language:FR
[2002/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/16, A61P35/00
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/47]
Extension statesAL07.05.2001
LT07.05.2001
LV07.05.2001
MK07.05.2001
RO07.05.2001
SI07.05.2001
TitleGerman:Verwendung von biologisch abbaubaren Mikrosphären zur Freisetzung eines Krebsmittels zur Behandlung des Glioblastoms[2000/47]
English:Use of biodegradable microspheres for the delivery of a anticancer agent for the treatment of glioblastoma[2000/47]
French:Utilisation de microsphères biodégradables libérant un agent anticancéreux pour le traitement du glioblastome[2000/47]
Examination procedure05.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
05.06.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
22.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
26.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.09.2002Fee for grant paid
09.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02008921.5  / EP1228755
Opposition(s)28.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]FR2693905  (RHONE MERIEUX [FR]) [Y] 23,24,26-29,31-33 * page 18 - page 19; example 2 *;
 [XY]  NN, Proceedings 1997 of the 24th International Symposium on controlled release of bioactive materials, DEERFIELD (US), CONTROLLED RELEASE SOCIETY, INC., XP002129728 [X] 1-22,34-37 * page 995 - page 996 * * référence 4 * [Y] 23,24,26-29,31-33
 [A]  T. PAINBENI ET AL., "internal morphology of poly(D,L-lactide-co-glycolide) BNCU-loaded microspheres. Influence on drug stability", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS AND BIOPHARMACEUTICS, Amsterdam (NL), (199801), vol. 45, no. 1, pages 31 - 39, XP000727896 [A] 25,30 * page 32, paragraph 2.2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0939-6411(97)00120-3