EP1063485 - Device and process for air separation by cryogenic distillation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states L'air Liquide Société Anonyme pour l'étude et l'exploration des procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Bussy, François 1, rue Montgallet 75012 Paris / FR | 02 /
Judas, Frédéric 12414 Piping Rock Drive US-77077 Houston, Texas / FR | [2004/46] |
Former [2000/52] | 01 /
De Bussy, François 1, rue Montgallet 75012 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
Judas, Frédéric 2, rue des Vallées 92290 Chatenay-Malabry / FR | Representative(s) | Mercey, Fiona Susan, et al L'Air Liquide Service Brevets et Marques 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | Mercey, Fiona Susan, et al L'Air Liquide, Service Brevets et Marques, 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00401768.7 | 21.06.2000 | [2000/52] | Priority number, date | FR19990007931 | 22.06.1999 Original published format: FR 9907931 | [2000/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1063485 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1063485 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F25J3/04 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
F25J3/04303 (EP,US);
F25J3/04466 (EP,US);
F25J3/04878 (EP,US);
F25J2200/06 (EP,US);
F25J2235/50 (EP,US);
F25J2250/40 (EP,US);
F25J2250/52 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/37] |
Former [2000/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Luftzerlegung durch Tieftemperaturrektifikation | [2000/52] | English: | Device and process for air separation by cryogenic distillation | [2000/52] | French: | Appareil et procédé de séparation d'air par distillation cryogénique | [2000/52] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 19.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0381319 (BOC GROUP INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4,8,10,13,14 * page 4, line 25 - line 28; figure -; claim - * * page 4, line 48 - line 49 * * page 5, line 11 - line 14 *; | [A]US5291737 (CAMBERLEIN FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [A] 1,2,4,5,8,10,12-14 * column 2, line 48 - line 50; figure -; claim - * * column 3, line 23 - line 25 *; | [A]US5582035 (RATHBONE THOMAS [GB], et al) [A] 1,4,5,8,10,12-14 * column 11, line 7 - line 9; figure -; claim - * * column 11, line 36 - line 38 * * column 13, line 51 - line 53 * * column 14, line 34 - line 39 * * column 14, line 53 - line 63 *; | [A]EP0556516 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [A] 1,4,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5765396 (BONAQUIST DANTE PATRICK [US]) [A] 1,4,10 * column W * | Examination | EP0682219 |