Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1067344

EP1067344 - Bath vaporiser-condenser with brazed plates and use thereof in an air distillation device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.09.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.09.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.10.2004  [2004/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/17]For all designated states
L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Former [2001/02]For all designated states
L'air Liquide Société Anonyme pour l'étude et l'exploration des procédés Georges Claude
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Darredeau, Bernard
14, rue des Pavillons
78500 Sartrouville / FR
 [2003/24]
Former [2001/02]01 / Darredeau, Bernard
14, rue des Pavillions
78500 Sartrouville / FR
Representative(s)Mercey, Fiona Susan , et al
L'Air Liquide
Service Brevets et Marques
75, quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/02]Mercey, Fiona Susan , et al
L'Air Liquide, Service Brevets et Marques, 75, quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date00401788.522.06.2000
[2001/02]
Priority number, dateFR1999000879107.07.1999         Original published format: FR 9908791
[2001/02]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1067344
Date:10.01.2001
Language:FR
[2001/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1067344
Date:05.11.2003
Language:FR
[2003/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP26.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:F25J3/00, F28F27/02
[2001/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/39]
Former [2001/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verdampferkondensor mit hartgelöteten Platten und deren Verwendung in einer Luftdestillationsvorrichtung[2001/02]
English:Bath vaporiser-condenser with brazed plates and use thereof in an air distillation device[2001/02]
French:Vaporiseur-condenseur à bain à plaques brasées et son application à un appareil de distillation d'air[2001/02]
Examination procedure10.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/36]
08.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2003Fee for grant paid
21.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1152432  (LINDE EISMASCH AG) [A] 1,9 * column 7, line 13 - column 8, line 29; figures 15-17 *;
 [A]US5775129  (SATCHELL JR DONALD PRENTICE [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * column W *;
 [DA]US4606745  (FUJITA IKUO [JP]) [DA] 1,9 * column W *;
 [A]US5901574  (ROHDE WILHELM [DE]) [A] 1,9 * column W *