Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1072857

EP1072857 - Guidance system for the recoiling mass of an artillery gun [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.06.2003
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.08.2003  [2003/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GIAT Industries
13, route de la Minière
78000 Versailles / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/05]For all designated states
GIAT INDUSTRIES
13, route de la Minière
78000 Versailles / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Soulaigre, Gérard
11, rue des Tamaris
18570 La Chapelle Saint Ursin / FR
 [2001/05]
Representative(s)Célanie, Christian
Cabinet Célanie
5 Avenue de Saint Cloud
B.P. 214
78002 Versailles Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/05]Célanie, Christian
Cabinet Célanie, 13 route de la Minière, BP 214
78002 Versailles Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date00401873.530.06.2000
[2001/05]
Priority number, dateFR1999000966526.07.1999         Original published format: FR 9909665
[2001/05]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1072857
Date:31.01.2001
Language:FR
[2001/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1072857
Date:21.08.2002
Language:FR
[2002/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:F41A25/22
[2001/05]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FI,   GB,   LI,   SE [2001/42]
Former [2001/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Führungssystem für rücklaufende Masse eines Geschützes[2001/05]
English:Guidance system for the recoiling mass of an artillery gun[2001/05]
French:Système de guidage pour la masse reculante d'une artillerie[2001/05]
Examination procedure21.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/16]
13.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.05.2002Fee for grant paid
02.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]CH26016  (HAUSSNER KONRAD [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *;
 [A]GB2237622  (RHEINMETALL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 9 - line 19 * * page 7, line 7 - line 25 * * figure 4 *;
 [A]US5703318  (FRANCHINO ANTHONY R [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 9 - line 17 * * figures 2,10-12 *