Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1071207

EP1071207 - Surface acoustic wave device and communications apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2013
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.07.2013  [2013/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.
10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP
[2007/37]
Former [2001/04]For all designated states
Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kadota, Michio, Intellectual Property Department
Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd., 2-26-10, Tenjin
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
 [2001/04]
Representative(s)Thévenet, Jean-Bruno , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/04]Thévenet, Jean-Bruno , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date00402108.524.07.2000
[2001/04]
Priority number, dateJP1999020782022.07.1999         Original published format: JP 20782099
[2001/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1071207
Date:24.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1071207
Date:10.09.2003
[2003/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP21.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:H03H9/64, H03H9/25, H03H9/02
[2003/19]
Former International [2001/04]H03H9/64
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/23]
Former [2001/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Akustische Oberflächenwellenanordnung und KommuniKationsgerät[2001/04]
English:Surface acoustic wave device and communications apparatus[2001/04]
French:Dispositif à ondes acoustiques de surface et appareil de communication[2001/04]
Examination procedure09.08.2000Examination requested  [2001/04]
16.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.01.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/31]
04.03.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2013/31]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.10.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
13.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
25.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
05.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
26.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
29.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
13.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
21.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
19.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201213   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE19830315  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,8,13 * figures 5,9 * [Y] 10;
 [A]US5349260  (ANEMOGIANNIS KIMON [DE], et al) [A] 10 * figures 5,6 *
 [X]  OMORI T ET AL, "Folded type SAW filters with minimised group delay deviation", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2000 IEEE/EIA INTERNATIONAL FREQUENCY CONTROL SYMPOSIUM AND EXHIBITION, Kansas City, MO, USA, (20000706), pages 296 - 300, XP010525563 [X] 1,13 * figure 2 * * page 297, column L, lines 9-27 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/FREQ.2000.887369
 [A]  SOLUCH W, "Application of a stopband multistrip coupler in a SAW resonator filter", ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM, 1994. PROCEEDINGS., 1994 IEEE CANNES, FRANCE 1-4 NOV. 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19941101), ISBN 0-7803-2012-3, pages 249 - 251, XP010139575 [A] 2 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ULTSYM.1994.401589
 [Y]  REINDL L, "Track-changing structures on YZ-LiNbO3", ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM, 1997. PROCEEDINGS., 1997 IEEE TORONTO, ONT., CANADA 5-8 OCT. 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19971005), ISBN 0-7803-4153-8, pages 77 - 82, XP010271366 [Y] 10 * figure 6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ULTSYM.1997.662984
 [A]  KADOTA M ET AL, "A BLEUSTEIN-GULYAEV-SHIMIZU WAVE RESONATOR HAVING RESONANCES FOR TVAND VCR TRAPS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19961201), vol. 44, no. 12, PART 2, ISSN 0018-9480, pages 2758 - 2762, XP000636449 [A] 1,8 * page 2758 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/22.554662