Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1076048

EP1076048 - Process for using treated leachates and device for utilizing this process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.08.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 29.08.2007  [2007/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yprema
7, rue Condorcet
94437 Chennevieres sur Marne / FR
[2001/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Basuyau, Vincent
2, rue de la fontaine du May
77590 Chartrette / FR
 [2001/15]
Former [2001/07]01 / Basuyau, Vincent
domicilié Cabinet Christian Schmit et Associés
95000 Cergy / FR
Representative(s)Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie
SCHMIT CHRETIEN
8, Place du Ponceau
95000 Cergy / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/07]Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie
Cabinet Christian Schmit et Associes, 8, place du Ponceau
95000 Cergy / FR
Application number, filing date00402240.607.08.2000
[2001/07]
Priority number, dateFR1999001037110.08.1999         Original published format: FR 9910371
[2001/07]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1076048
Date:14.02.2001
Language:FR
[2001/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1076048
Date:23.10.2002
Language:FR
[2002/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP20.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:C04B18/10, B09B3/00
[2001/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/07]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Anwendung von behandelten Sickerwässern und Vorrichtung zur Durchfürung des Verfahrens[2001/07]
English:Process for using treated leachates and device for utilizing this process[2001/07]
French:Procédé d'utilisation des lixiviats traités et dispositif utilisant ce procédé[2001/07]
Examination procedure27.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
31.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.05.2002Fee for grant paid
25.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.10.2002
FI23.10.2002
GB23.10.2002
GR23.10.2002
IE23.10.2002
IT23.10.2002
NL23.10.2002
DK23.01.2003
PT23.01.2003
SE23.01.2003
DE24.01.2003
ES29.04.2003
[2007/35]
Former [2007/10]AT23.10.2002
FI23.10.2002
GB23.10.2002
GR23.10.2002
IE23.10.2002
NL23.10.2002
DK23.01.2003
PT23.01.2003
SE23.01.2003
DE24.01.2003
ES29.04.2003
Former [2004/22]AT23.10.2002
FI23.10.2002
GB23.10.2002
GR23.10.2002
IE23.10.2002
NL23.10.2002
PT23.01.2003
SE23.01.2003
DE24.01.2003
ES29.04.2003
Former [2004/04]AT23.10.2002
FI23.10.2002
GR23.10.2002
IE23.10.2002
NL23.10.2002
PT23.01.2003
SE23.01.2003
DE24.01.2003
ES29.04.2003
Former [2004/02]AT23.10.2002
FI23.10.2002
GR23.10.2002
IE23.10.2002
NL23.10.2002
PT23.01.2003
SE23.01.2003
DE24.01.2003
Former [2004/01]AT23.10.2002
FI23.10.2002
GR23.10.2002
IE23.10.2002
NL23.10.2002
PT23.01.2003
SE23.01.2003
Former [2003/43]AT23.10.2002
FI23.10.2002
GR23.10.2002
NL23.10.2002
PT23.01.2003
SE23.01.2003
Former [2003/37]AT23.10.2002
GR23.10.2002
NL23.10.2002
PT23.01.2003
SE23.01.2003
Former [2003/31]GR23.10.2002
NL23.10.2002
PT23.01.2003
SE23.01.2003
Former [2003/30]NL23.10.2002
PT23.01.2003
SE23.01.2003
Former [2003/29]PT23.01.2003
SE23.01.2003
Former [2003/27]SE23.01.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9216317  (LANDFILL SERVICE CORP [US]) [A] 1 * claim 4 *;
 [A]FR2473036  (LE I AKADEMII K [SU]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]DE19531942  (VER ENERGIEWERKE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]FR2754747  (ACCETTA ANDRE [FR]);
 [A]US5340235  (MILLIKEN LARRY D [US]);
 [A]EP0362125  (SULZER AG [CH]);
 [A]EP0630687  (SIPAC SA [BE])