blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1081356

EP1081356 - Intake system of engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.01.2006
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/09]For all designated states
Honda Giken Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
Former [2001/10]For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Suzuki, Osamu
K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
02 / Hamauzu, Akira
K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
03 / Iimuro, Akihiro
K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama / JP
 [2001/10]
Representative(s)Poulin, Gérard, et al
BREVALEX
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Poulin, Gérard, et al
Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2001/10]Poulin, Gérard, et al
Société de Protection des Inventions 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date00402351.124.08.2000
[2001/10]
Priority number, dateJP1999025090903.09.1999         Original published format: JP 25090999
[2001/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1081356
Date:07.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1081356
Date:10.10.2001
[2001/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1081356
Date:02.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.08.2001
ClassificationIPC:F02D9/10
[2001/10]
CPC:
F02D9/16 (EP); F02B2275/20 (EP); F02D2009/0294 (EP);
F02D9/107 (EP)
Designated contracting statesES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/27]
Former [2001/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Einlasssystem für Brennkraftmaschine[2001/10]
English:Intake system of engine[2001/10]
French:Système d'admission pour moteur[2001/10]
Examination procedure11.12.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/09]
11.04.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.08.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
13.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.2004Fee for grant paid
06.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
20.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
18.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
17.05.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
17.05.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5718202  (BENTZ WILLY [DE], et al) [X] 1,4 * column 2, line 20 - column 5, line 27; figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]US5271269  (RILLING HEINZ [DE], et al) [Y] 1,4 * column 2, line 30 - column 5, line 8; figures 1-7 *;
 [Y]EP0889213  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 1,4 * column 4, line 9 - column 7, line 19; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US4718272  (PLAPP GUENTHER [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 33 - column 5, line 38; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US4866981  (MATSUMOTO OSAMU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 64 - column 4, line 50; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US4812803  (HOCHHOLZER REINHARD [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 31 - column 6, line 30; figures 1-7 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.