EP1094156 - Method and apparatus for confining a bituminous road covering around a rail [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCREG 49, rue du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2001/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tessonneau, Hervé Marcel 27 chemin du Bois de Serres 69570 Dardilly / FR | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | Jacobson, Claude, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Jacobson, Claude, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00402824.7 | 12.10.2000 | [2001/17] | Priority number, date | FR19990012968 | 18.10.1999 Original published format: FR 9912968 | [2001/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1094156 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E01C9/06, E01B21/00 | [2001/17] | CPC: |
E01B21/00 (EP);
E01C9/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DK, GB, IE, LI [2002/03] |
Former [2001/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | RO | 09.10.2001 | Title | German: | Rückhaltungsverfahren und -vorrichtung einer bituminösen Strassendecke in der Nähe einer Schiene | [2001/17] | English: | Method and apparatus for confining a bituminous road covering around a rail | [2001/17] | French: | Procédé de confinement d'enrobés bitumineux au voisinage d'un rail et dispositif pour sa mise en oeuvre | [2001/17] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 18.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1566246 (BRAMLEY MATTHEW F) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [A]CH169277 (BERTSCHINGER WALO [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29907716U (POLYPLAN GMBH POLYURETHAN MASC [DE]) |