Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1096493

EP1096493 - Off-center voice-coil motor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.05.2004
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.07.2004  [2004/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IOMEGA CORPORATION
1821 West 4000 South
Roy, UT 84067 / US
[2001/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Swenson, Mark A.
2512 Ravenwood Drive
Lafayette, CO 80026 / US
 [2001/18]
Representative(s)Hirsch & Associés
137, rue de l'Université
75007 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Cabinet Hirsch
34, Rue de Bassano
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date00402843.713.10.2000
[2001/18]
Priority number, dateUS1999043176401.11.1999         Original published format: US 431764
[2001/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1096493
Date:02.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1096493
Date:26.03.2003
[2003/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:G11B21/10, G11B21/08, G11B5/55
[2003/13]
Former International [2001/18]G11B21/10
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/51]
Former [2001/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Exzentrischer Schwingspulenmotor[2001/18]
English:Off-center voice-coil motor[2001/18]
French:Moteur à bobine mobile excentrique[2001/18]
Examination procedure27.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/28]
23.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
05.11.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
05.11.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
05.11.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US4853808  (LUTZ FRANK T [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *