Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1098557

EP1098557 - Laser exposure device for plates [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.11.2007
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AUTOMA-TECH
Parc d'Affaires des Portes, Chaussée du Vexin
27100 Val de Reuil / FR
[2007/03]
Former [2001/19]For all designated states
Automa-Tech
Parc d'Affaires des Portes, Chaussée du Vexin
27100 Val de Reuil / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Charbonnier, Serge
22 rue Grande
27120 Chambray / FR
02 / Boureau, Damien
31, rue Stanislas Girardin
76000 Rouen / FR
 [2001/19]
Representative(s)Dronne, Guy , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Dronne, Guy , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 Rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Former [2001/19]Dronne, Guy , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date00402850.216.10.2000
[2001/19]
Priority number, dateFR1999001388605.11.1999         Original published format: FR 9913886
[2001/19]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1098557
Date:09.05.2001
Language:FR
[2001/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1098557
Date:17.01.2007
Language:FR
[2007/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:H05K3/00, G02B26/10, G03F7/20, H04N1/192
[2001/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/19]
TitleGerman:Laser-Belichtungsgerät für Platten[2001/19]
English:Laser exposure device for plates[2001/19]
French:Machine d'exposition d'un panneau à un rayonnement laser[2001/19]
Examination procedure16.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/37]
11.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.2006Fee for grant paid
01.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.10.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
18.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY17.01.2007
DK17.01.2007
FI17.01.2007
IE17.01.2007
NL17.01.2007
SE17.04.2007
GR18.04.2007
PT18.06.2007
GB16.10.2007
IT16.10.2007
LU16.10.2007
ES17.10.2007
[2009/37]
Former [2009/33]CY17.01.2007
DK17.01.2007
FI17.01.2007
IE17.01.2007
NL17.01.2007
SE17.04.2007
GR18.04.2007
PT18.06.2007
GB16.10.2007
IT16.10.2007
ES17.10.2007
Former [2009/20]DK17.01.2007
FI17.01.2007
IE17.01.2007
NL17.01.2007
SE17.04.2007
GR18.04.2007
PT18.06.2007
GB16.10.2007
IT16.10.2007
ES17.10.2007
Former [2009/03]DK17.01.2007
FI17.01.2007
IE17.01.2007
NL17.01.2007
SE17.04.2007
GR18.04.2007
PT18.06.2007
GB16.10.2007
IT16.10.2007
Former [2008/23]DK17.01.2007
FI17.01.2007
IE17.01.2007
NL17.01.2007
SE17.04.2007
GR18.04.2007
PT18.06.2007
IT16.10.2007
Former [2008/19]DK17.01.2007
FI17.01.2007
IE17.01.2007
NL17.01.2007
SE17.04.2007
GR18.04.2007
PT18.06.2007
Former [2007/48]DK17.01.2007
FI17.01.2007
IE17.01.2007
NL17.01.2007
SE17.04.2007
PT18.06.2007
Former [2007/46]DK17.01.2007
FI17.01.2007
NL17.01.2007
SE17.04.2007
PT18.06.2007
Former [2007/40]FI17.01.2007
NL17.01.2007
SE17.04.2007
PT18.06.2007
Former [2007/38]FI17.01.2007
SE17.04.2007
PT18.06.2007
Former [2007/36]FI17.01.2007
PT18.06.2007
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE4225946  (KRAUSE BIAGOSCH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [Y] 5,6;
 [Y]EP0729265  (BARCO GRAPHICS NV [BE]) [Y] 5,6 * column 1 - column 2; figure 3 *;
 [A]US5795689  (OKAMURA YUICHI [JP]);
 [A]JPH1191164
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, [A] * abstract *