EP1096701 - Data transmission on a speech channel in a mobile telephone network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zaizouni, Mostafa 4 Allée de L'Orangerie 95600 Eaubonne / FR | 02 /
Gervais, Aurélie 41 Bd de la Tour Maubourg 75007 Paris / FR | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Korakis-Ménager, Sophie, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54, Rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/25] | Korakis-Ménager, Sophie, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/18] | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété industrielle 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00402974.0 | 26.10.2000 | [2001/18] | Priority number, date | FR19990013496 | 28.10.1999 Original published format: FR 9913496 | [2001/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1096701 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04Q7/30 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
H04W88/181 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/18] | Title | German: | Datenübertragung über einen Sprachkanal in einem Mobiltelefonnetz | [2001/18] | English: | Data transmission on a speech channel in a mobile telephone network | [2001/18] | French: | Transmission de données sur un canal de parole dans un réseau de téléphonie mobile | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 19.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/52] | 05.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0545783 (SAGEM [FR]) [X] 1-4,6,9-16 * Le document en entier *; | [X] - LIN D ET AL, "Data compression of voiceband modem signals", 40TH IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. ON THE MOVE IN THE 90'S, IEEE, New York, NY, USA, (19900506), pages 323 - 325, XP002143129 [X] 1,6,13,14 * Introduction * * page 324, colonne 1, ligne 8- ligne 12 * * Evaluation * | [X] - COLEMAN A ET AL, "Subjective performance evaluation of the RPE-LTP codec for the pan-European cellular digital mobile radio system", GLOBECOM '89. IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION, IEEE, New York, NY, USA, (19891127), pages 1075 - 1079 vol.2, XP002143130 [X] 1,2,6,7,12-15 * page 1075, column 1, line 18 - line 21 * * page 1075, column 2, line 34 - line 41 * * page 1076, column 1, line 5 - line 13 * * page 1078, column 1, line 15 - line 19 * | [X] - MUELLER A JOSEPH ET AL, "DSP implemented dual 9600/7200 bps TCM modem for mobile communications over FM voice radios", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1997 6TH IEEE PACIFIC RIM CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, COMPUTERS AND SIGNAL PROCESSING. PART 2 (OF 2), IEEE, Piscataway, NJ, USA, (19970820), vol. 2, pages 758 - 761, XP002143351 [X] 1,11-16 * page 758, colonne 2,ligne 22-ligne 25 * * page 758, colonne 2,ligne 29-ligne 33 * * figure 1 * * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PACRIM.1997.620370 |