Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099476

EP1099476 - Chlorinated and fluorinated catalyst comprising a group VIII metal and an additional metal and its use in aromatics hydrogenation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
???moredetails.lapse.edited??? ES
published on 11.07.2018  [2018/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institut Français du Pétrole
1 & 4 avenue de Bois Préau
92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR
[2006/45]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE
1 & 4 avenue Bois Préau
92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Marchal-George, Nathalie
12, route du Millénaire
69230 Saint Genis Laval / FR
02 / Kasztelan, Slavik
27, rue Queneau
92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2002/51]
Former [2001/20]Andréeff, François , et al
Département Brevets, Institut Français du Petrole, 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau
92852 Rueil Malmaison / FR
Application number, filing date00403036.731.10.2000
[2001/20]
Priority number, dateFR1999001414010.11.1999         Original published format: FR 9914140
FR1999001414110.11.1999         Original published format: FR 9914141
FR1999001414310.11.1999         Original published format: FR 9914143
[2001/20]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1099476
Date:16.05.2001
Language:FR
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1099476
Date:08.11.2006
Language:FR
[2006/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:B01J27/128, B01J27/12, C10G49/02, C10G45/48, C10G45/52, B01J23/38, B01J23/54, B01J23/76, B01J23/89
[2006/45]
Former International [2001/20]B01J27/128, B01J27/12, C10G49/02, B01J103/16, B01J103/14, C10G45/48, C10G45/52, B01J23/38, B01J23/54, B01J23/76, B01J23/89
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   IT,   NL [2002/07]
Former [2001/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Chlorierter und fluorierter Aromatenhydrierungskatalysator mit einem Metall der Gruppe VIII und einem zusätzlichen Metall[2001/20]
English:Chlorinated and fluorinated catalyst comprising a group VIII metal and an additional metal and its use in aromatics hydrogenation[2001/20]
French:Catalyseur fluoré et chloré comprenant un métal du groupe VIII et un métal additionnel et son utilisation pour l'hydrogénation de composés aromatiques[2001/20]
Examination procedure16.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/03]
23.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
10.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.07.2006Fee for grant paid
06.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.08.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES08.11.2006
[2018/28]
Former [2008/04]deleted
Former [2007/35]IT08.11.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2695648  (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [A] 1-8,11-17 * claims 1-7 * * page 4, line 21 - page 7, line 8 *;
 [A]FR2223337  (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [A] 1-5,7-9,13-17 * claims 1-4 *;
 [A]FR2006803  (UNIVERSAL OIL PROD CO [US]) [A] 1-6,11-17 * claims 33-40 *;
 [A]RU2044031  ;
 [DA]EP0751204  (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [DA] 1-5,13-17 * claims 1-10 *;
 [A]FR1596032  (UNIVERSAL OIL PRODUCTS COMPANY) [A] 1-6,13-15 * page 3, line 23 - line 38 *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 22, Database accession no. 1996-220406, XP002140861 & RU2044031 C 19950920 (KRASD LENNEFTEKHIM RES PRODN ASSOC) [A] 1-6,11-17 * abstract *