Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1101560

EP1101560 - Welding process for assembling two metallic workpieces [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.12.2005
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.01.2006  [2006/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vossloh Cogifer
54, avenue Victor Hugo
92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR
[2004/47]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
COGIFER COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'INSTALLATIONS FERROVIAIRES
40, Quai de l'Ecluse
F-78290 Croissy-Sur-Seine / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Lacave, Jean-Christophe
8, rue Jean Monnet, Domaine de l'Europe
67500 Haguenau / FR
02 / Mugg, Philippe
16, rue du château Fiat
67500 Haguenau / FR
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Blot, Philippe Robert Emile , et al
Cabinet Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Blot, Philippe Robert Emile , et al
c/o Cabinet Lavoix, 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date00403121.709.11.2000
[2001/21]
Priority number, dateFR1999001437016.11.1999         Original published format: FR 9914370
[2001/21]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1101560
Date:23.05.2001
Language:FR
[2001/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1101560
Date:26.01.2005
Language:FR
[2005/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:B23K9/16, B23K101/26, B23K9/038, E01B11/50
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2002/08]
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vefahren zum Schweissen von zwei metallischen Werkstücken[2001/21]
English:Welding process for assembling two metallic workpieces[2001/21]
French:Procédé de soudage de deux éléments métalliques[2001/21]
Examination procedure07.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/01]
19.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
21.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.2004Fee for grant paid
29.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
17.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
15.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]BE633603  (LA SOUDURE ÉLECTRIQUE AUTOGÈNE, PROCÉDÉS ARCOS) [A] 1,4-8,12 * page 7, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * page 6, line 10 - line L; figures 2,5 *;
 [A]WO9116167  (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 10,11 * abrégé;; figure 4 *;
 [A]FR2054930  (PARIS & OUTREAU ACIERIES) [A] 1 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 4; figure 1 *;
 [A]CH678538  (OERLIKON BUEHRLE SCHWEISSTECH) [A] 2,3 * column 4, paragraph 6; figure 3 *;
 [A]DE1515248  (UNION CARBIDE CORP) [A] * page 7; figures 1-3 * * claim 1 *
ExaminationUS5175405
 US5773779
 DE1191922