Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1102519

EP1102519 - Fast locking device,particularly for microwave oven door [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2005
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CROUZET APPLIANCE CONTROLS
Les Petits Champs
F-26120 Montelier Chabeuil / FR
[2001/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Vanneyre, André
c/o Crouzet Appliance Controls, Les Petits Champs
26120 Montelier Chabeuil / FR
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Geismar, Thierry , et al
NOVAGRAAF IP 122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
[2009/37]
Former [2001/21]Geismar, Thierry , et al
Bouju Derambure Bugnion, 52, rue de Monceau
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date00403198.516.11.2000
[2001/21]
Priority number, dateFR1999001436716.11.1999         Original published format: FR 9914367
[2001/21]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1102519
Date:23.05.2001
Language:FR
[2001/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1102519
Date:12.01.2005
Language:FR
[2005/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:H05B6/76
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2002/08]
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Schnellsperrvorrichtung, insbesondere für die Tür eines Mikrowellenofens[2001/21]
English:Fast locking device,particularly for microwave oven door[2001/21]
French:Dispositif de verrouillage rapide, notamment pour porte de four à micro-ondes[2001/21]
Examination procedure15.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/33]
24.11.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.03.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
24.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.2004Fee for grant paid
22.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.01.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2002TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5300745  (CHARTRAIN PIERRE [FR], et al) [X] 1,3-5,9,14 * the whole document * [A] 2,4-6,16;
 [A]US5512735  (HASHIMOTO HIROYUKI [JP]);
 [A]US4749835  (FUKUMOTO SHIGEAKI [JP])