Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1102451

EP1102451 - Validation procedure of data in a terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  24.03.2006
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.03.2006Refusal of applicationpublished on 10.05.2006  [2006/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue de la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Helaine, Hubert
206, Hurricane Way
Woodley Reading, Berkshire RG5 4UH / GB
02 / Bury, Sébastien
10 rue Française
75002 Paris / FR
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Lamoureux, Bernard , et al
Alcatel Lucent
Intellectual Property & Standards
54 Rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Lamoureux, Bernard , et al
COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété industrielle 30, avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date00403199.316.11.2000
[2001/21]
Priority number, dateFR1999001463522.11.1999         Original published format: FR 9914635
[2001/21]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1102451
Date:23.05.2001
Language:FR
[2001/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1102451
Date:06.06.2001
[2001/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/09]
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Datenfreigabeverfahren in einem Endgerät[2001/21]
English:Validation procedure of data in a terminal[2001/21]
French:Procédé de validation de données dans un terminal[2001/21]
Examination procedure06.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/05]
03.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/19]
19.12.2005Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
05.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0813132  (IBM [US]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 25 - page 5, line 23 * * figure - *;
 [A]EP0889660  (IBM [US]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 12 - page 8, line 4 *;
 [A]EP0951191  (SWISSCOM AG [CH]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 2 - column 10, line 2 *;
 [A]EP0944203  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 22 - column 8, line 20 *;
 [A]US5371794  (DIFFIE WHITFIELD [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 67 - column 9, line 16 *;
 [A]WO9907173  (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1 * page 5, line 21 - page 7, line 16 *;
 [A]  "DIGITAL CELLULAR TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM (PHASE 2+);MOBILE STATION EXECUTION ENVIRONMENT (MExE); SERVICE DESCRIPTION; Stage 1 (GSM 02.57 version 7.1.0 Release 1998) ETSI TS 101 741 v7.1.0", EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATION STANDARD, (199908), pages 1 - 21, XP002145174 [A] 1 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [11.3] *