Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1101448

EP1101448 - Anterior transpedicular fixation system for maintaining a vertebral column [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2001/21]Anterior transpedicular fixation system and method for maintaining a vertebral column
[2006/44]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.02.2008
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.02.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.04.2008  [2008/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The University of Hong Kong
G18, Eliot Hall, Pokfulam Road
Hong Kong / CN
[2007/17]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
The University of Hong Kong
G18, Eliot Hall, Pokfulam Road
Hong Kong / CN
Inventor(s)01 / Luk, Dip Kei
Duchess of Kent Hospital, 12 Sandy Bay Road
Hong-Kong / CN
02 / Lu, Weijia
Flat F., 23/F, Block 13A, South Horizons
Hong Kong / CN
03 / Lu, Duo Sai
12 Sandy Bay Road, Pokfulam
Hong-Kong / CN
 [2001/26]
Former [2001/21]01 / Luk, Dip Kei
20 Scenic Villa Drive, Scenic Villa
Hong Kong / CN
02 / Lu, Weijia
Flat F., 23/F, Block 13A, South Horizons
Hong Kong / CN
03 / Lu, Duo Sai
12 Sandy Bay Road, Pokfulam
Hong-Kong / CN
Representative(s)Hirsch & Associés
137, rue de l'Université
75007 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Cabinet Hirsch
34, Rue de Bassano
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date00403203.317.11.2000
[2001/21]
Priority number, dateUS19990165971P17.11.1999         Original published format: US 165971 P
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1101448
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1101448
Date:30.05.2001
[2001/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1101448
Date:25.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/70
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2002/08]
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorder- und transpediculares Fixiersystem zum Befestigen der Wirbelsäule[2006/44]
English:Anterior transpedicular fixation system for maintaining a vertebral column[2006/44]
French:Système de fixation transpédiculaire antérieure de maintien de la colonne vertébrale[2006/44]
Former [2001/21]Vorder- und transpediculares Fixiersystem und Verfahren zum Befestigen der Wirbelsäule
Former [2001/21]Anterior transpedicular fixation system and method for maintaining a vertebral column
Former [2001/21]Système de fixation transpédiculaire antérieure et procédé de maintien de la colonne vertébrale
Examination procedure17.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/03]
21.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2007Fee for grant paid
06.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.01.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5180381  (AUST GILBERT M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,11 * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 10; figure 1 * [Y] 3,4,6,10,12-14;
 [YA]US5147361  (OJIMA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 3,4,6,12-14 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 13; figure 1A * [A] 1,11;
 [YA]EP0284530  (RAZAFINDRATSIVA CESAR [FR]) [Y] 10 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 14; figure 4 * [A] 1,5,11;
 [YA]US5728097  (MATHEWS HALLETT H [US]) [Y] 4 * column 8, line 2 - line 6; figures 1,2 * [A] 1,11;
 [DA]US5324290  (ZDEBLICK THOMAS A [US], et al) [DA] 1,11 * column W *;
 [A]EP0574098  (AMERICAN MED ELECTRONICS [US]) [A] 1,11 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5395372  (HOLT RICHARD T [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * column W *
by applicantUS4433676
 US4653481
 US4269178
 US4409968
 US4648388
 US4289123
 US5324290