Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1103233

EP1103233 - Monobloc blood filter production method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.06.2006
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 30.08.2006  [2006/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
B. Braun Medical SAS
204 Avenue du Maréchal Juin
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
[2005/30]
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
B. Braun Medical Société Anonyme
204 Avenue du Maréchal Juin
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Guy, M. Nadal
8, rue Condorcet
86000 Poitiers / FR
 [2001/22]
Representative(s)Lerner, François , et al
5, rue Jules Lefèbvre
75009 Paris / FR
[2005/30]
Former [2001/22]Lerner, François
5, rue Jules Lefèbvre
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date00403309.827.11.2000
[2001/22]
Priority number, dateFR1999001490026.11.1999         Original published format: FR 9914900
[2001/22]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1103233
Date:30.05.2001
Language:FR
[2001/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1103233
Date:10.08.2005
Language:FR
[2005/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/01
[2001/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/08]
Former [2001/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Herstellungsverfahren eines Monoblockblutfilters[2001/22]
English:Monobloc blood filter production method[2001/22]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un filtre sanguin monobloc[2001/22]
Examination procedure05.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/48]
24.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2005Fee for grant paid
06.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
06.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
17.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB10.08.2005
[2006/35]
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9925252  (CORDIS CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * page 10, line 13 - page 11, line 5; figures 6,7,10 *;
 [A]EP0759287  (BRAUN CELSA SA [FR]) [A] 1,4 * column 3, line 11 - line 48 * * figures 6-8 *;
 [A]WO9923976  (SALVIAC LTD [IE], et al) [A] 1,4 * page 18, line 4 - line 5 * * page 19, line 11 - line 12 * * page 20, line 3 - line 6 * * page 20, line 10 - line 19 * * figures 16,17,19A-19C; claim 52 *;
 [A]EP0815803  (CORDIS EUROP [NL]) [A] 2 * column 3, line 24 - line 26 * * figure - *;
 [A]US5938683  (LEFEBVRE JEAN-MARIE [FR]) [A] 2 * column 2, line 58 - line 60 * * figures 1,2 *
by applicantUS4688553
 FR2573646
 FR2694491
 US5383887
 FR2764503
 EP0714641
 US5421955
 EP0709767