Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1106530

EP1106530 - Dispenser of fluid product [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.06.2004  [2004/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sopac Medical
Z.A.E. 21, rue Gaston Monmousseau
95192 Goussainville / FR
[2001/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Prouvost, Michel
26, rue de Garches
92210 Saint-Cloud / FR
 [2001/24]
Representative(s)Casalonga, Axel
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/24]Casalonga, Axel
BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date00403395.704.12.2000
[2001/24]
Priority number, dateFR1999001534506.12.1999         Original published format: FR 9915345
[2001/24]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1106530
Date:13.06.2001
Language:FR
[2001/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1106530
Date:25.06.2003
Language:FR
[2003/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:B65D83/00
[2001/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/10]
Former [2001/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Spender für fluides Produkt[2001/24]
English:Dispenser of fluid product[2001/24]
French:Distributeur de produit fluide[2001/24]
Examination procedure22.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/03]
05.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2003Fee for grant paid
13.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]FR1248664  (LONG & HAMBLY LTD) [A] 1,4-6,9,10 * page 1, column R, line 3 - page 2, column L, line 16; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]CH240683  (BOUVIER ROBERT [CH]) [A] 1-3 * column L, line 15 - column R, line 38; figure 1 *;
 [A]FR1019325  (STEINER) [A] 1 * page 1, column L, line 30 - column R, line 9; figures 2,3; claim 1 *