Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1215813

EP1215813 - Tuner for digital receiver with multiple input and multiple output channels [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.08.2007
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Juniper Networks, Inc.
1194 North Mathilda Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
[2002/32]
Former [2002/25]For all designated states
Pacific Broadband Communications, Inc.
4-14 rue Ferrus
75014 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Buda Fabian
3 Square Grange
75013 Paris / FR
 [2002/25]
Representative(s)Casalonga, Axel
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/25]Casalonga, Axel
BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date00403506.913.12.2000
[2002/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1215813
Date:19.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1215813
Date:04.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:H03D3/00, H04N7/173
[2002/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/11]
Former [2002/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Tuner für digitalen Empfänger mit mehreren Eingangskanälen und Ausgangskanälen[2002/25]
English:Tuner for digital receiver with multiple input and multiple output channels[2002/25]
French:Circuit d'accord pour récepteur numérique avec plusieurs canaux d'entrée et plusieurs canaux de sortie[2002/25]
Examination procedure27.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/44]
30.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.08.2006Fee for grant paid
16.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.07.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.10.2006
BE04.10.2006
CH04.10.2006
CY04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IT04.10.2006
LI04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
TR04.10.2006
IE13.12.2006
LU13.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
GR05.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
[2009/03]
Former [2008/36]AT04.10.2006
BE04.10.2006
CH04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IT04.10.2006
LI04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
TR04.10.2006
IE13.12.2006
LU13.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
GR05.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2008/19]AT04.10.2006
BE04.10.2006
CH04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IT04.10.2006
LI04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
IE13.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
GR05.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/48]AT04.10.2006
BE04.10.2006
CH04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IT04.10.2006
LI04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
IE13.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/37]AT04.10.2006
BE04.10.2006
CH04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IT04.10.2006
LI04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
MC31.12.2006
DK04.01.2007
SE04.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/35]AT04.10.2006
BE04.10.2006
CH04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
IT04.10.2006
LI04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
SE04.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/30]AT04.10.2006
BE04.10.2006
CH04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
LI04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
SE04.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/28]AT04.10.2006
FI04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
SE04.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/26]FI04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
SE04.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
PT16.03.2007
Former [2007/25]FI04.10.2006
NL04.10.2006
SE04.01.2007
ES15.01.2007
Former [2007/21]NL04.10.2006
ES15.01.2007
Former [2007/19]NL04.10.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]US5454007  (DUTTA SANTANU) [A] 1,4 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0809403  (AT & T CORP) [A] 1,4 * figure 4 *;
 [A]US5864672  (WOODWARD SHERYL LEIGH ET AL) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0841817  (AT & T CORP)