Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1101826

EP1101826 - Quenching process after low pressure carburising [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.2005Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 09.03.2005  [2005/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ETUDES ET CONSTRUCTIONS MECANIQUES
46, Rue Jean Vaujany, Technisud
38100 Grenoble / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
ETUDES ET CONSTRUCTIONS MECANIQUES
46, Rue Jean Vaujany, Technisud
38100 Grenoble / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Pelissier, Laurent
Le Roulet
38430 Saint Jean de Moirans / FR
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)de Beaumont, Michel
1, rue Champollion
38000 Grenoble / FR
[2001/21]
Application number, filing date00410142.416.11.2000
[2001/21]
Priority number, dateFR1999001444917.11.1999         Original published format: FR 9914449
[2001/21]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1101826
Date:23.05.2001
Language:FR
[2001/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:C21D1/613, C23C8/22, C21D9/00
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/08]
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Abschreckverfahren nach Niederdruck-Aufkohlung[2001/21]
English:Quenching process after low pressure carburising[2001/21]
French:Procédé de trempe après cémentation à basse pression[2001/21]
Examination procedure19.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/03]
24.11.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
13.05.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
12.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
18.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.01.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[AD]FR2678287  (ETUDES CONST MECANIQUES [FR]);
 [AD]FR2771754  (ETUDES CONST MECANIQUES [FR]);
 [A]DE4208485  (J. WÜNNING);
 [A]DE3736501  (DEGUSSA);
 [Y]  ALTENA H, "NIEDERDRUCK-AUFKOHLUNG MIT HOCHDRUCK-GASABSCHRECKUNG VERFAHRENSTECHNIK UND ERGEBNISSE", HAERTEREI TECHNISCHE MITTEILUNGEN,DE,CARL HANSER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, (19980301), vol. 53, no. 2, ISSN 0341-101X, pages 93 - 101, XP000755093 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [Y]  HOFFMANN R ET AL, "MOEGLICHKEITEN UND GRENZEN DER GASABKUEHLUNG", HAERTEREI TECHNISCHE MITTEILUNGEN,DE,CARL HANSER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, (19920301), vol. 47, no. 2, ISSN 0341-101X, pages 112 - 122, XP000267300 [Y] 1-10 * page 122 *
 [A]  TINSCHER R ET AL, "FIXTURHAERTUNG VON WAELZLAGERRINGEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON GASFOERMIGEN ABSCHRECKMEDIEN", HAERTEREI TECHNISCHE MITTEILUNGEN,DE,CARL HANSER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, (19980301), vol. 53, no. 2, ISSN 0341-101X, pages 108 - 115, XP000755095