Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020143

EP1020143 - Upholstered corner seat convertible into double bed [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 27.11.2013  [2013/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROSET S.A.
Briord
01470 Serrières de Briord / FR
[2000/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Brisson, Claude
Rue Corot
38510 Morestel / FR
02 / Gomez, Didier
80 rue des Archives
75004 Paris / FR
[2000/34]
Former [2000/29]01 / Brisson, Claude
Rue Corot
38510 Morestel / FR
02 / Gomez, Didier
17 avenue de Villars
75007 Paris / FR
Representative(s)Maureau, Philippe , et al
Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU
12, rue Boileau
B.P. 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Maureau, Philippe , et al
Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Application number, filing date00420004.411.01.2000
[2000/29]
Priority number, dateFR1999000035312.01.1999         Original published format: FR 9900353
[2000/29]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1020143
Date:19.07.2000
Language:FR
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1020143
Date:16.04.2003
Language:FR
[2003/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:A47C17/36
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/29]
TitleGerman:In ein Doppelbett umwandelbares Ecksofa[2000/29]
English:Upholstered corner seat convertible into double bed[2000/29]
French:Canapé d'angle transformable en lit double[2000/29]
Examination procedure13.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/02]
24.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.01.2003Fee for grant paid
20.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY16.04.2003
FI16.04.2003
GB16.04.2003
IE16.04.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
LU11.01.2004
[2013/48]
Former [2007/08]CY16.04.2003
FI16.04.2003
GB16.04.2003
IE16.04.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
LU11.01.2004
Former [2007/04]FI16.04.2003
GB16.04.2003
IE16.04.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
LU11.01.2004
Former [2005/23]FI16.04.2003
GB16.04.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
DE17.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
LU11.01.2004
Former [2004/23]FI16.04.2003
GB16.04.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
DE17.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/22]FI16.04.2003
GB16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/05]FI16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/04]GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
ES30.10.2003
Former [2004/02]GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
Former [2004/01]PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
Former [2003/41]SE16.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]US2691174  (HARRISON MORTON R) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE9012849U  (C. LOHOFF) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE899250  (HEINZ PAULISCH) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3084351  (KULP HARRY B, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [PX]DE29919083U  (HUKLA WERKE GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1 * the whole document *