Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1102213

EP1102213 - Method for guaranteeing the correct operation of a taximeter's electronic sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.06.2008
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AUTOMATISMES ET TECHNIQUES AVANCEES - A.T.A.
Route de Trets, La Barque
13710 Fuveau / FR
[2007/33]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
AUTOMATISMES ET TECHNIQUES AVANCEES - A.T.A.
Route de Trets, La Barque
13710 Fuveau / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Ricard, Claude
1206 Fairfield Road
Glencoe, IL 60022 / US
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Denjean, Eric , et al
Cabinet Laurent et Charras
20, rue Louis Chirpaz
B.P. 32
69131 Ecully Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Denjean, Eric , et al
Cabinet Laurent et Charras 20, rue Louis Chirpaz B.P. 32
F-69131 Ecully Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date00420233.913.11.2000
[2001/21]
Priority number, dateFR1999001469922.11.1999         Original published format: FR 9914699
[2001/21]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1102213
Date:23.05.2001
Language:FR
[2001/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1102213
Date:15.08.2007
Language:FR
[2007/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:G07B13/02, G07C7/00, G06M1/274, G01P3/487, G01P21/02
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2002/08]
Former [2001/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Funktionssicherung eines elektronischen Sensors eines Taxameters[2001/21]
English:Method for guaranteeing the correct operation of a taximeter's electronic sensor[2001/21]
French:Procédé pour sécuriser le fonctionnement du capteur électronique associé à un taximètre[2001/21]
Examination procedure17.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/29]
24.11.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.03.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
05.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
26.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2007Fee for grant paid
15.02.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30]
Request for further processing for:26.06.2006Request for further processing filed
26.06.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.08.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
16.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
13.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
13.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.01.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
08.01.2002TR   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.08.2007
CH30.11.2007
LI30.11.2007
[2008/35]
Former [2008/13]AT15.08.2007
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0928970  (LEGRAND ERIC [FR], et al) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2726108  (SEMEL OY [FI]) [A] 1,4 * page 3, line 25 - page 6, line 8 *;
 [A]DE3832541  (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 32 *;
 [A]DE4221891  (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 2 * the whole document *