Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033269

EP1033269 - Air nozzle for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.02.2002
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MGI COUTIER (S.A.)
F-01410 Champfromier / FR
[2000/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Caoduro, Jean-Paul
46 rue Rogg-haas
68510 Sierentz / FR
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Nithardt, Roland
Cabinet Nithardt & Associés S.A.
14 Boulevard Alfred Wallach
B.P. 1445
68071 Mulhouse Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Nithardt, Roland
Cabinet Nithardt & Associés S.A. 14 Boulevard Alfred Wallach B.P. 1445
68071 Mulhouse Cedex / FR
Former [2000/36]Nithardt, Roland
CABINET NITHARDT ET ASSOCIES Boite Postale 1445
68071 Mulhouse Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date00440060.229.02.2000
[2000/36]
Priority number, dateFR1999000284202.03.1999         Original published format: FR 9902842
[2000/36]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1033269
Date:06.09.2000
Language:FR
[2000/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60H1/34
[2000/36]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/21]
Former [2000/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Luftdüse für ein Kraftfahrzeug[2000/36]
English:Air nozzle for vehicle[2000/36]
French:Barillet d'aérateur pour véhicule automobile[2000/36]
Examination procedure07.03.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/12]
18.09.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/12]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.05.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
29.05.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
29.05.2001M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4327265  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,5 * column 1, line 50 - line 66 * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 3 * * figures 2,3; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0888916  (FICKENSCHER & CO GMBH WERKZEUG [DE]) [A] 1,5 * column 5, line 18 - column 6, line 28 * * figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [A]FR2766765  (COUTIER MOULAGE GEN IND [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 2 - line 24 * * figures 1,2; claim 1 *