Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1064842

EP1064842 - Farrowing crate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 06.10.2004  [2004/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GALVELPOR SA
51-53 rue Hervé-de-Guébriand
29429 Landerneau / FR
[2001/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Alonso, Philippe
51-53 rue Hervé de Guébriant
29419 Landerneau / FR
02 / Guedes, Yves
51-53 rue Hervé de Guébriant
29419 Landerneau / FR
03 / Le Gall, Pascal
51-53 rue Hervé de Guébriant
29419 Landerneau / FR
[2001/01]
Representative(s)Maillet, Alain
Cabinet Le Guen Maillet
5, place Newquay
B.P. 70250
35802 Dinard Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [N/P]Maillet, Alain
Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 5 Place Newquay B.P. 70250
25802 Dinard Cedex / FR
Former [2001/01]Maillet, Alain
SCP Le Guen & Maillet, 5, Place Newquay, B.P. 70250
35802 Dinard Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date00460039.130.06.2000
[2001/01]
Priority number, dateFR1999000874701.07.1999         Original published format: FR 9908747
[2001/01]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1064842
Date:03.01.2001
Language:FR
[2001/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1064842
Date:03.09.2003
Language:FR
[2003/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP24.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:A01K1/02, A01K1/015
[2001/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   DK,   FR [2001/38]
Former [2001/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Abferkelbucht[2001/01]
English:Farrowing crate[2001/01]
French:Case de maternité[2001/01]
Examination procedure01.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/15]
04.07.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
21.12.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
11.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.06.2003Fee for grant paid
16.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.09.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
21.09.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK03.12.2003
[2004/41]
Documents cited:Search[XYA]EP0841004  (ROTECNA SA [ES]) [X] 6,8,9 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 23 * * figures 15-18 * [Y] 1,3,4 [A] 10;
 [Y]US4294195  (RODENBERG JOSEPH H, et al) [Y] 1,3,4 * column 4, line 12 - line 24 * * figures 1,5,8 *;
 [A]DE9203466U  (DIETER WIEBUSCH) [A] 6-10 * page 3, line 10 - line 22 * * page 4, line 4 - line 6 * * page 5, line 4 - line 9 * * figures 1-4 *
 [A]  "GALVELPOR,FR,LANDERNEAU", GALVELPOR,FR,LANDERNEAU, XP002078415 [A] 1 * the whole document *