Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020610

EP1020610 - Jamb and roller shutter box [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.02.2006
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Coffrelite SARL
1 Place Hubert Beuve Mery
45000 Orleans / FR
[2004/29]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
Coffrelite SARL
125 rue du Bocage
37540 Saint-Cyr-sur-Loire / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Schoenn-Anchling, Michel
125 rue du Bocage
37540 Saint-Cyr-Sur-Loire / FR
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Duthoit, Michel Georges André
Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés
96/98, Boulevard Carnot
B.P. 105
59027 Lille Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Duthoit, Michel
Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 19, Square Dutilleul BP 105
59027 Lille Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date00490002.311.01.2000
[2000/29]
Priority number, dateFR1999000029811.01.1999         Original published format: FR 9900298
[2000/29]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1020610
Date:19.07.2000
Language:FR
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1020610
Date:06.04.2005
Language:FR
[2005/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:E06B9/17
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/29]
TitleGerman:Zarge und Rolladenkasten[2000/29]
English:Jamb and roller shutter box[2000/29]
French:Jambage et coffre de volet roulant[2000/29]
Examination procedure01.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
28.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2005Fee for grant paid
01.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
03.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.04.2005
CY06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
GB06.04.2005
IE06.04.2005
IT06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
DE07.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
[2009/02]
Former [2007/35]AT06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
GB06.04.2005
IE06.04.2005
IT06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
DE07.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2006/35]AT06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
GB06.04.2005
IE06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
DE07.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2006/23]AT06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
GB06.04.2005
IE06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2006/14]AT06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
GB06.04.2005
NL06.04.2005
DK06.07.2005
GR06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
ES17.07.2005
PT08.09.2005
Former [2006/13]AT06.04.2005
FI06.04.2005
GB06.04.2005
DK06.07.2005
SE06.07.2005
Former [2005/52]FI06.04.2005
SE06.07.2005
Former [2005/50]SE06.07.2005
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE4013000  (PRIX WERK WIEHOFSKY GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,10 * figures 1,2; claim 1 * [A] 2;
 [XA]DE2243277  (BECK REINHOLD) [X] 1 * figures 1,2,5,8; claim 1 * [A] 2;
 [A]DE9213706U  (WIEHOFSKY FRITZ [DE]) [A] 1,2,7,10 * figures 1,3; claim 10 *;
 [A]DE29611948U  (BUBENDORFF SA [FR]) [A] 1,2,8,10 * page 4, lines 15-19; figures 1,2 *