Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1098051

EP1098051 - Fence post and fence obtained by assembling wired panels on the posts [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.06.2009
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.11.2011  [2011/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boutteau, Corinne
6, rue des Berceaux
59145 Berlaimont / FR
[2001/19]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/19]
Representative(s)Louiset, Raphaël
Dejade & Biset
35, rue de Châteaudun
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2007/03]Louiset, Raphael
Dejade & Biset 35, rue de Châteaudun
75009 Paris / FR
Former [2005/19]Gorree, Jean-Michel , et al
Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2001/19]Hennion, Jean-Claude , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 27bis, rue du Vieux Faubourg
59800 Lille / FR
Application number, filing date00490047.803.11.2000
[2001/19]
Priority number, dateFR1999001424405.11.1999         Original published format: FR 9914244
[2001/19]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1098051
Date:09.05.2001
Language:FR
[2001/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1098051
Date:20.08.2008
Language:FR
[2008/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:E04H17/20, E04H17/16, E04H17/12
[2001/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2008/34]
Former [2002/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Former [2002/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Former [2001/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Zaunpfosten und Zaun erstellt durch Zusammenfügen von Zaunmatten an den Pfosten[2002/25]
English:Fence post and fence obtained by assembling wired panels on the posts[2001/19]
French:Poteaux de clôture et clôture obtenue par l'assemblage de panneaux en treillis sur de tels poteaux[2001/19]
Former [2001/19]Zaunpfosten und Zaun erstellt durch zusammenfügen von Zaunmatten an den Pfosten
Examination procedure30.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/26]
21.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.03.2002Fee for grant paid
30.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)25.05.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
09.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
28.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200203   M06   Fee paid on   08.01.2003
Stay/Interruption10.06.2002Stay of proceedings
05.06.2008Resumption of proceedings
[2008/28]
Licence(s)ID:01 00/exclusive
For:[AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR]
Licencee:PLACE S.A.
19, rue d'Aulnoye
59145 Berlaimont / FR
Date:19.11.2001
[2008/34]
Former [2002/11]ID:01 00/exclusive
For:all designated states
Licencee:PLACE S.A.
19, rue d'Aulnoye
59145 Berlaimont / FR
Date:19.11.2001
[2008/34]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY20.08.2008
FI20.08.2008
PT20.08.2008
TR20.08.2008
GR30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
[2011/46]
Former [2011/39]CY20.08.2008
FI20.08.2008
TR20.08.2008
GR30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2010/37]CY20.08.2008
FI20.08.2008
TR20.08.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2010/34]CY20.08.2008
FI20.08.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2010/11]FI20.08.2008
MC30.11.2008
Former [2009/29]MC30.11.2008
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0949395  (FABRICACION DE MALLAS VICARIO [ES]) [A] 1-3,8-10 * column 3, line 18 - line 51; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]FR2676488  (DIRICKX SA [FR]) [A] 1,5,6,8-10 * page 3, line 8 - page 5, line 3; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]FR2502223  (BOSMY ETS RENE [FR]) [A] 1,8,9 * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 14; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]GB2259924  (DUNKLEY DOUGLAS GORDON [GB]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2,4,7 *