Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1041058

EP1041058 - Improved procedure for treatment of pig manure and fertiliser product thereby obtained [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.04.2004
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.05.2004  [2004/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ros Roca, S.A.
Avda. Cervera, s/n
25300 Tarrega (Lleida) / ES
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
Ros Roca, S.A.
Avda. Cervera, s/no
25300 Tarrega (Lleida) / ES
Inventor(s)01 / Sunyer Martin, Ramon
C/San Juan,6
08720 Vilafranca del Penedès / ES
[2000/52]
Former [2000/40]01 / Sunyer Martin, Ramon
C/San Juan,6
08720 Vilafranca del Penedés, Barcelona / ES
Representative(s)Primo de Rivera y Urquijo, Jose A.
General Martinez Campos, 51
28010 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]Primo de Rivera y Urquijo, Jose Antonio
General Martinez Campos, 51
28010 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date00500047.626.03.2000
[2000/40]
Priority number, dateES1999000062327.03.1999         Original published format: ES 9900623
[2000/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1041058
Date:04.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1041058
Date:18.09.2002
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:C05F3/00
[2000/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/40]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Behandlung von Schweinegülle und ein dadurch erhältliches Düngemittel[2000/40]
English:Improved procedure for treatment of pig manure and fertiliser product thereby obtained[2000/40]
French:Procéde de traitement de lisier de porc et engrais obtenu par ce procédé[2000/40]
Examination procedure06.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/19]
15.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/21]
16.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
06.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0564298  (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 3;
 [Y]FR2686814  (ASS VALORIS DEJECT ANIMA [FR]) [Y] 1 * page 7, line 6 *;
 [Y]CN1083461  ;
 [Y]EP0576389  (DREWS MANFRED [DE]) [Y] 1 * page 2, column 2 *;
 [A]US5531907  (WILLIAMS PAUL J [GB], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 11, column 2 - page 13, column 5 *;
 [A]DE4444032  (KUEHN UMWELTPRODUKTE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * page 2, column 2 * * page 3, column 4 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0701983  (CERES MILIEU HOLDING BV [NL]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5593590  (STEYSKAL FELIX [AT]) [A] 1,2 * page 7, column 4 *;
 [A]WO9315026  (CHEMRING GROUP PLC [GB]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 24, Database accession no. 1995-179783, XP002206969 & CN1083461 A 19940309 (LIANG Z) [Y] 3 * abstract *