Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1050211

EP1050211 - Machine for cleaning, disinfection and deparasitation of animals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.04.2003
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 29.09.2004  [2004/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Segura Munoz, Angel Maria
Artesanos, s/n
43800 Valls Tarragona / ES
[2000/45]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/45]
Representative(s)Perez Bonal, Bernardo
Explanada 8
28040 Madrid / ES
[2000/45]
Application number, filing date00500053.403.04.2000
[2000/45]
Priority number, dateES1999000118907.05.1999         Original published format: ES 9901189
[2000/45]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1050211
Date:08.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1050211
Date:19.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:A01K13/00
[2000/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/35]
Former [2001/30](deleted) 
Former [2000/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Reinigen, Desinfizieren und Parasitentfernen von Tieren[2000/45]
English:Machine for cleaning, disinfection and deparasitation of animals[2000/45]
French:Dispositif à nettoyer, désinfecter et déparasiter des animaux[2000/45]
Examination procedure09.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/15]
05.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.03.2002Fee for grant paid
18.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)20.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.06.2001AT   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.2001
15.06.2001BE   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.2001
15.06.2001CH   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.2001
15.06.2001CY   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.2001
15.06.2001DE   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.2001
15.06.2001DK   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.2001
15.06.2001ES   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.2001
15.06.2001FI   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.2001
15.06.2001FR   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.2001
15.06.2001GB   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.2001
15.06.2001GR   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.2001
15.06.2001IE   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.2001
15.06.2001IT   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.2001
15.06.2001LU   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.2001
15.06.2001MC   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.2001
15.06.2001NL   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.2001
15.06.2001PT   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.2001
15.06.2001SE   M01   Fee paid on   26.06.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.06.2002
CH19.06.2002
FI19.06.2002
GR19.06.2002
LI19.06.2002
DK19.09.2002
SE19.09.2002
PT23.09.2002
ES20.12.2002
[2004/40]
Former [2004/04]AT19.06.2002
CH19.06.2002
GR19.06.2002
LI19.06.2002
DK19.09.2002
SE19.09.2002
PT23.09.2002
ES20.12.2002
Former [2003/45]AT19.06.2002
CH19.06.2002
GR19.06.2002
LI19.06.2002
DK19.09.2002
SE19.09.2002
PT23.09.2002
Former [2003/21]AT19.06.2002
CH19.06.2002
GR19.06.2002
LI19.06.2002
SE19.09.2002
PT23.09.2002
Former [2003/20]AT19.06.2002
CH19.06.2002
GR19.06.2002
LI19.06.2002
SE19.09.2002
Former [2003/16]AT19.06.2002
CH19.06.2002
LI19.06.2002
SE19.09.2002
Former [2003/10]AT19.06.2002
SE19.09.2002
Former [2002/49]SE19.09.2002
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0861590  (LEADERCAN S L [ES]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2753877  (BESNARD MICHEL [FR]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *
by applicantES1027445U