EP1069262 - A vehicle parking apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states O'Hanlon, Andrew Pluckstown Straffan County Kildare / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states O'Hanlon, Andrew Pluckstown Straffan, County Kildare / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/03] | Representative(s) | Schütte, Gearoid Cruickshank 8a Sandyford Business Centre Sandyford Dublin 18 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Schütte, Gearoid Cruickshank & Co., 1 Holles Street Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 00650079.7 | 12.07.2000 | [2001/03] | Priority number, date | IE19990000585 | 12.07.1999 Original published format: IE 990585 | [2001/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1069262 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1069262 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | [2002/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E04H6/06, B66F7/28 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
B66F7/02 (EP);
B66F7/28 (EP);
E04H6/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/03] | E04H6/06 | Designated contracting states | [2002/43] |
Former [2001/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fahrzeugabstellvorrichtung | [2001/03] | English: | A vehicle parking apparatus | [2001/03] | French: | Dispositif de parcage d'un véhicule | [2001/03] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/23] | 02.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.10.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.10.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4209276 (ROSEN ARNOLD M [US]) [X] 1,4,5 * column 3, line 6 - line 59; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2,3,6-10; | [Y]US2579688 (MCCORMICK CONNIE M) [Y] 2,3 * column 2, line 23 - line 27; figure 1 *; | [YA]US2569982 (ESTEL JR GEORGE A) [Y] 6-9 * column 2, line 43 - column 5, line 20; figure - * [A] 3; | [Y]DE2223590 (R WEISSHAUPT AG MASCHF) [Y] 10 * page 2, line 20 - page 4, line 20; figure - *; | [A]FR2631017 (BERNARDI FRANCIS [FR]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 23 - line 38 * * page 3, line 1 - line 17; figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE1923394 (TREPEL KG MASCHINENFABRIK) [A] 3,5-9 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 35; figure - *; | [A]DE1917197 (KALTENBACH WERNER) [A] 3,5-9 * page 16, line 21 - line 26; figure 5 * | by applicant | US3750899 | US5035562 |