EP1026509 - Method and apparatus for determining harmonics in electric network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Oy Strömbergintie 1 00380 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states ABB Oy Strömbergintie 1 00380 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states ABB Substation Automation Oy Muottitie 2 A 65320 Vaasa / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lehtinen, Reijo Kuikankatu 1 C 148 33100 Tampere / FI | 02 /
Marjusaari, Ville Lindforsinkatu 8E 85 33720 Tampere / FI | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Peltonen, Antti Sakari, et al Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Peltonen, Antti Sakari, et al Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 00660019.1 | 07.02.2000 | [2000/32] | Priority number, date | FI19990000239 | 08.02.1999 Original published format: FI 990239 | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1026509 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1026509 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | [2004/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1026509 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01R23/20 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
G01R23/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/05] |
Former [2000/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Feststellen von Oberwellen in einem elektrischen Netz | [2000/32] | English: | Method and apparatus for determining harmonics in electric network | [2000/32] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de détermination des harmoniques dans un réseau électrique | [2000/32] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/46] | 13.11.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.03.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 21.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.12.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.12.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0758750 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,6 * column 1, line 5 - line 10 * * column 3, line 10 - line 30 * * column 6, line 21 - line 33 * * figure 4; claim 1 * | [A] - MILLER A J V ET AL, "The Application Of Multi-Rate Digital Signal Processing Techniques To The Measurement Of Power System Harmonic Levels", CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS ARTICLE IEEE, (19920922), pages 7 - 15, XP010207823 [A] 1,6 * abstract * * page 9, column 1, line 3 - line 28 * * page 9, column 1, line 43 - line 58 * * page 10, column 1, line 40 - line 59 * * page 11, column 1, line 30 - column 2, line 15 * * page 12, column 1, line 20 - page 13, column 1, line 10; figures 9,10 * * page 13, column 1, line 28 - line 51 * |