Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1047243

EP1047243 - Method for the transmission of multimedia messages [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  03.12.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2004Refusal of applicationpublished on 19.01.2005  [2005/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/11]
Former [2000/43]For all designated states
NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD.
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Servanto, Jarkko
Santavuorentie 7 A 11
00400 Helsinki / FI
02 / Sivanandan, Mohan
Taivaanvuohentie 10 A 13
00200 Helsinki / FI
[2000/43]
Representative(s)Pursiainen, Timo Pekka
Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy
Visiokatu 1
33720 Tampere / FI
[N/P]
Former [2000/43]Pursiainen, Timo Pekka
Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy, Hermiankatu 6
33720 Tampere / FI
Application number, filing date00660069.617.04.2000
[2000/43]
Priority number, dateFI1999000087719.04.1999         Original published format: FI 990877
[2000/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1047243
Date:25.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1047243
Date:11.09.2002
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04Q7/22, H04L12/58
[2002/37]
Former International [2000/43]H04L29/06, H04Q7/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/22]
Former [2000/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren für die Übertragung von Multimedianachrichten[2000/43]
English:Method for the transmission of multimedia messages[2000/43]
French:Procédé de transmission des messages multimédia[2000/43]
Examination procedure26.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/19]
03.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2005/03]
27.08.2004Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9720442  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 26 * * page 4, line 27 - page 7, line 3 * * figure 1 * * figure 2A * * figure 2C *;
 [A]WO9819438  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * page 3, line 10 - page 7, line 13 *;
 [A]  SMALE S, "HP OPENMAIL SHORT MESSAGE SERVICE (SMS) GATEWAY: TH MOBILE PHONE AS AN E-MAIL CLIENT-OF-CHOISE", INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON MOBILE MULTI-MEDIA COMMUNICATIONS, XX, XX, (19950411), pages 1 - 6, XP000671022 [A] 1-19 * page 1; figure 1 * * page 3 - page 4 *
 [A]  KYLANPAA M ET AL, "Nomadic access to information services by a GSM phone", COMPUTERS AND GRAPHICS, PERGAMON PRESS LTD. OXFORD, GB, (19960901), vol. 20, no. 5, ISSN 0097-8493, pages 651 - 658, XP004015416 [A] 1-19 * paragraph [4.1.5] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0097-8493(96)00039-8
 [A]  GAY V ET AL, "Conception of a multimedia electronic mail based on standards", DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING SYSTEMS, 1993., PROCEEDINGS OF THE FOURTH WORKSHOP ON FUTURE TRENDS OF LISBON, PORTUGAL 22-24 SEPT. 1993, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19930922), ISBN 0-8186-4430-3, pages 16 - 22, XP010096809 [A] 6,16 * page 18, column R, line 1 - line 32 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/FTDCS.1993.344181